EP1941346 - DOCUMENT PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Praxeon, Inc. P.O. Box 426018 Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2008/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENCINA, Nicolas 45 Belmont Street, Unit 2 Charlestown, MA 02129 / US | 02 /
GILPIN, Kevin 36 Dwight St 3 Brookline, MA 02446 / US | 03 /
UNDERWOOD, Dennis 28 John A Andrew Street Jamaica Plain, MA 02130 / US | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06815198.4 | 21.09.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006US37001 | Priority number, date | US20050719100P | 21.09.2005 Original published format: US 719100 P | US20050719101P | 21.09.2005 Original published format: US 719101 P | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007035912 | Date: | 29.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1941346 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/00 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
G06F16/951 (EP,US);
G06F16/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/28] | Title | German: | DOKUMENTVERARBEITUNG | [2008/28] | English: | DOCUMENT PROCESSING | [2008/28] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE DOCUMENTS | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 21.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/39] | 06.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2012 | 30.09.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003120647 (AIKEN ALEX [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6658423 (PUGH WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2005203898 (BOYER STEPHEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0020] *; | [Y] - CONRAD J G ET AL, "Online duplicate document detection: Signature reliability in a dynamic retrieval environment", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INFORMATION AND KNOWLEDGE MANAGEMENT, PROCEEDINGS - CIKM 2003: PROCEEDINGS OF THE TWELFTH ACM INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INFORMATION AND KNOWLEDGE MANAGEMENT 2003 ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY US, (2003), pages 443 - 452, XP002599905 [Y] 1-15 * page 443, column r, line 1 - line 34 * * page 446, column r, line 10 - line 34 * | [Y] - POGUE C A ET AL, "Use of text signatures for document retrieval in a highly parallel environment", PARALLEL COMPUTING, ELSEVIER PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/0167-8191(87)90025-1, vol. 4, no. 3, ISSN 0167-8191, (19870601), pages 259 - 268, (19870601), XP024229696 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-8191(87)90025-1 | [Y] - SCHLEIMER S ET AL, "Winnowing: Local Algorithms for document fingerprinting", SIGMOD 2003. PROCEEDINGS OF THE ACM SIGMOD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MANAGEMENT OF DATA. SAN DIEGO, CA, JUNE 9 - 12, 2003; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE ACM SIGMOD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MANAGEMENT OF DATA], NEW YORK, NY : ACM, US LNKD- DOI:10.1145/8727, (20030609), ISBN 978-1-58113-634-0, pages 76 - 85, XP002366234 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/872757.872770 | [Y] - GONZALO NAVARRO ED - BAEZA-YATES R ET AL, MODERN INFORMATION RETRIEVAL, Chapter 8: Indexing and Searching, MODERN INFORMATION RETRIEVAL, ACM PRESS, NEW YORK, PAGE(S) 191 - 228, (19990101), ISBN 978-0-201-39829-8, XP002457291 [Y] 1-15 * chapter 8.3.2 Signature Files * | [Y] - HEINTZE N, "Scalable document fingerprinting", PROCEEDINGS OF THE USENIX WORKSHOP OF ELECTRONIC COMMERCE, XX, XX, (19960101), pages 1 - 10, XP002954511 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2003227643 (REDDY PAUL JAMES [NZ], et al); | [Y]US2005033452 (MILNE DONALD A [US], et al); | [Y]US2005124010 (SHORT JAY M [US], et al); | [Y]US2005182933 (RITZ DEREK [CA], et al) |