EP1934737 - CELL PROCESSOR METHODS AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8270 / JP | [2017/30] |
Former [2016/24] | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | ||
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Incorporated 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2010/47] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | ||
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 2-6-21, Minami-Aoyama, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATES, John, P. 919 East Hillsdale Blvd 2nd Floor Foster City CA 94404 / US | 02 /
INOUE, Keisuke 2-6-21 Minami-Aoyama Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | 03 /
CERNY, Mark, E. Company Cerny Games 653 Hanley Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90049 / US | [2019/38] |
Former [2008/45] | 01 /
BATES, John, P. 919 East Hillsdale Blvd 2nd Floor Foster City CA 94404 / US | ||
02 /
INOUE, Keisuke 2-6-21 Minami-Aoyama Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | |||
03 /
CERNY, Mark, E. Company Cerny Games 653 Hanley Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90049 / US | |||
Former [2008/26] | 01 /
BATES, John, P. 919 East Hillsdale Blvd 2nd Floor Foster City CA 94404 / US | ||
02 /
INOUE, Keisuke 2-6-21 Minami-Aoyama Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | |||
03 /
CERNY, Mark, E. 919 East Hillsdale Blvd 2nd Floor Foster City CA 94404 / US | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/38] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2008/26] | Turner, James Arthur D. Young & Co. 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06815381.6 | 25.09.2006 | [2008/26] | WO2006US37334 | Priority number, date | US20050238077 | 27.09.2005 Original published format: US 238077 | US20050238087 | 27.09.2005 Original published format: US 238087 | US20050238095 | 27.09.2005 Original published format: US 238095 | US20050238085 | 27.09.2005 Original published format: US 238085 | US20050238086 | 27.09.2005 Original published format: US 238086 | US20050257761 | 24.10.2005 Original published format: US 257761 | US20060461390 | 31.07.2006 Original published format: US 461390 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007038455 | Date: | 05.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1934737 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1934737 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/48, G06F9/50 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
G06F9/5027 (EP,US);
G06F9/4881 (EP,US);
G06F9/5033 (EP,US);
G06F9/5038 (EP,US);
G06F9/505 (EP,US);
G06F9/5066 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/26] | G06F9/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/38] |
Former [2008/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZELLENPROZESSORVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN | [2008/26] | English: | CELL PROCESSOR METHODS AND APPARATUS | [2008/26] | French: | PROCEDES ET APPAREIL POUR PROCESSEURS CELLULAIRES | [2008/26] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 10.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10186971.7 / EP2312441 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.09.2006 | AT | 18.09.2019 | CY | 18.09.2019 | CZ | 18.09.2019 | DK | 18.09.2019 | EE | 18.09.2019 | ES | 18.09.2019 | FI | 18.09.2019 | IT | 18.09.2019 | LT | 18.09.2019 | LV | 18.09.2019 | MC | 18.09.2019 | NL | 18.09.2019 | PL | 18.09.2019 | RO | 18.09.2019 | SE | 18.09.2019 | SI | 18.09.2019 | SK | 18.09.2019 | TR | 18.09.2019 | IE | 25.09.2019 | LU | 25.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | BG | 18.12.2019 | GR | 19.12.2019 | IS | 19.01.2020 | PT | 20.01.2020 | [2022/26] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 25.09.2006 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
IE | 25.09.2019 | ||
LU | 25.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
IE | 25.09.2019 | ||
LU | 25.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
IE | 25.09.2019 | ||
LU | 25.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
IE | 25.09.2019 | ||
LU | 25.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
LU | 25.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | EE | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 18.09.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9706484 (NOVELL INC [US]) [Y] 1-11,27-39,45-47 * abstract * * page 2, line 5 - line 38 * * page 6, line 1 - page 11, line 33 * * page 13, line 15 - page 23, line 27; figures 1,4,5 *; | [Y]WO02091180 (ORACLE CORP [US]) [Y] 1-11,27-39,45-47 * abstract * * page 2, line 29 - page 5, line 28 * * page 7, line 3 - page 13, line 4; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US6665699 (HUNTER JESSE D [US], et al) [A] 1-47 * abstract * * column 2, line 21 - line 40 * * column 3, line 20 - column 6, line 46 *; | [Y]US2005188373 (INOUE KEISUKE [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11,27-39,45-47 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1; figures 2-5,7,8 * * page 1, paragraph 8 - page 2, paragraph 16 * * page 4, paragraph 63 - paragraph 65 * * page 6, paragraph 81 - page 9, paragraph 103 * * page 10, paragraph 113 - page 11, paragraph 121; claims 1-11 *; | [Y]US2005188372 (INOUE KEISUKE [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11,27-39,45-47 * page 1; figures 2-5,7,8 * * page 1, paragraph 8 - page 2, paragraph 25 * * page 3, paragraph 60 - page 8, paragraph 101 *; | [A] - KAHLE J A ET AL, "Introduction to the Cell multiprocessor", IBM JOURNAL OF RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT IBM USA, vol. 49, no. 4-5, ISSN 0018-8646, (200507), pages 589 - 604, URL: https://www.research.ibm.com/journal/rd/494/kahle.pdf, (20070125), XP002415988 [A] 1-47 * the whole document * | [A] - CANDEA G M ET AL, "Vassal: loadable scheduler support for multi-policy scheduling", PROCEEDINGS OF THE USENIX WINDOWS NT SYMPOSIUM, (19980803), pages 157 - 166, XP009019604 [A] 1-47 * abstract * * page 158, column R, paragraph 6 - page 161, column L, paragraph 1 * | Examination | US5592671 | by applicant | WO9706484 | WO02091180 | US6665699 | US2007074207 | - KAHLE J A ET AL., "Introduction to the Cell multiprocessor", IBM JOURNAL OF RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, (200507), vol. 49, no. 4-5, pages 589 - 604, XP002415988 | - CANDEA G M ET AL., "Vassal: loadable scheduler support for multi-policy scheduling", PROCEEDINGS OF THE USENIX WINDOWS NT SYMPOSIUM, (19980803), pages 157 - 166 |