EP2066303 - SYSTEM FOR TREATMENT OF EATING DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/24] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TREATMENT OF EATING DISORDERS | ||
[2015/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plensat, LLC 3000 F Danville Boulevard 383 Alamo, CA 94507 / US | [2016/18] |
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states Plensat, LLC 3000 F Danville Boulevard 383 Alamo, CA 94507 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STERLING, Bernhard, B. 3000 F Danville Blvd. 383 Alamo, CA 94507 / US | 02 /
MILLS, Alexander K. - deceased / US | [2016/18] |
Former [2009/24] | 01 /
STERLING, Bernhard, B. 3000 F Danville Blvd. 383 Alamo, CA 94507 / US | ||
02 /
MILLS, Alexander K. (deceased) . . / US | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | Zwicker, Jörk, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/14] | Zwicker, Jörk, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Partnerschaft Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/24] | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 06815468.1 | 26.09.2006 | [2009/24] | WO2006US37483 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008039186 | Date: | 03.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2066303 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2066303 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/12, A61K9/46, A61K9/20 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
A61F5/0036 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/18] |
Former [2009/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ESSSTÖRUNGEN | [2015/44] | English: | SYSTEM FOR TREATMENT OF EATING DISORDERS | [2015/44] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES DE L'ALIMENTATION | [2015/44] |
Former [2009/24] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ESSSTÖRUNGEN | ||
Former [2009/24] | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TREATMENT OF EATING DISORDERS | ||
Former [2009/24] | MÉTHODE ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES DE L'ALIMENTATION | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 19.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 18.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.09.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 23.09.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.10.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.02.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 06.02.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.02.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   15.12.2010 | 30.09.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2012 | 30.09.2012 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2013 | 30.09.2013 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.09.2006 | AT | 04.05.2016 | BE | 04.05.2016 | BG | 04.05.2016 | CY | 04.05.2016 | CZ | 04.05.2016 | DK | 04.05.2016 | EE | 04.05.2016 | ES | 04.05.2016 | FI | 04.05.2016 | IS | 04.05.2016 | IT | 04.05.2016 | LT | 04.05.2016 | LV | 04.05.2016 | MC | 04.05.2016 | PL | 04.05.2016 | RO | 04.05.2016 | SE | 04.05.2016 | SI | 04.05.2016 | SK | 04.05.2016 | TR | 04.05.2016 | GR | 05.08.2016 | PT | 05.09.2016 | IE | 26.09.2016 | LU | 26.09.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 26.09.2006 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 26.09.2016 | ||
LU | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 26.09.2006 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 26.09.2016 | ||
LU | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 26.09.2006 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 26.09.2016 | ||
LU | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 26.09.2016 | ||
LU | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
IE | 26.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 04.05.2016 | |
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 04.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0795324 (JAGOTEC AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,4-9,14 * page 3, line 56 - page 4, line 15 * * page 4, line 56 - page 5, line 5 * * page 5, line 28 - line 37 * * page 5, line 58 - page 6, line 6 * * figures 1-4; claim 11 * * page 10, line 55 - page 11, line 47 * [Y] 3,12,13; | [YA]US2004192582 (BURNETT DANIEL R [US], et al) [Y] 12,13 * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034] * * claims 1-3 * [A] 1-11,14; | [YA]US2004219186 (AYRES JAMES W [US]) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0068] * [A] 1,2,4-14; | [A]WO0200213 (TEVA PHARMA [IL], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 13, line 1 - page 14, line 22 * * page 17, line 9 - page 19, line 25 * * page 28, line 24 - page 29, line 2 * * claim 33 * * claim 54 * | International search | [X]US5780057 (CONTE UBALDO [IT], et al); | [Y]US5055306 (BARRY BRIAN W [GB], et al) | Examination | US4812315 | WO2005101983 | DE19920855 | by applicant | EP0795324 | US2004192582 | US2004219186 |