EP1928262 - METHODS FOR EXTENDING THE SHELF-LIFE OF FOOD COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING POLYUNSATURATED FATTY ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. 400 Southwest 8th Avenue Topeka, KS 66603 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Hill's Pet Nutrition Inc. 400 Southwest 8th Avenue Topeka, KS 66603 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRITSCH, Dale Allen 3800 SW King Forest Road Topeka, KS 66610 / US | 02 /
GHORPADE, Viswas 908 Summerfield Court Lawrence, KS 66049 / US | 03 /
LIN, Hungwei, Charlie 905 Summerfield Place Lawrence, KS 66047 / US | 04 /
CLARK, Harry Mead 3810 SW Dukeries Road Topeka, KS 66610 / US | 05 /
POPE, Brent Karl 6446 SW 24th Street Topeka, KS 66614 / US | 06 /
MILLICAN, Jerry Don 3440 SW MacVicar Avenue Topeka, KS 66611 / US | [2008/24] | Representative(s) | Wichmann, Hendrik, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 06816115.7 | 29.09.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006US38628 | Priority number, date | US20050722780P | 30.09.2005 Original published format: US 722780 P | [2008/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007041581 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1928262 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A23K50/42, C11B5/00 | [2017/46] | CPC: |
A23K50/40 (EP,US);
A23K20/158 (EP,US);
A23K20/20 (US);
A23K40/20 (EP,US);
A23K40/25 (EP,US);
Y10S426/805 (EP,US);
Y10S426/807 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/24] | A23K1/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERLÄNGERUNG DER HALTBARKEIT VON MEHRFACH UNGESÄTTIGTE FETTSÄUREN ENTHALTENDEN LEBENSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2008/24] | English: | METHODS FOR EXTENDING THE SHELF-LIFE OF FOOD COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING POLYUNSATURATED FATTY ACIDS | [2008/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR L EXTENSION DE LA DURÉE DE VIE DES COMPOSITIONS ALIMENTAIRES CONTENANT DES ACIDES GRAS POLY-INSATURÉS | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 14.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/36] | 10.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4935250 (COX JAMES P [US]) [X] 1-8,10,12,13,18-22,26-29,32-34 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 50 * * examples 1-3 *; | [I]WO0160166 (APPLIED FOOD BIOTECH INC [US]) [I] 1-22,32-34 * examples 1-5 *; | [I]WO2004075653 (MACKINNON WAYNE [CA]) [I] 1-34* page 6 - page 9 * | International search | [X]US2004248763 (FREEMAN LISA M [US], et al); | [X]US6042857 (JONES DAVID R [US], et al); | [Y]US5431927 (HAND MICHAEL S [US], et al); | [Y]US5055328 (EVERT CHARLES P [US], et al); | [Y]US6358546 (BEBIAK DAVID M [US], et al); | [Y]US4216234 (PROCTER DONALD [US], et al); | [Y]US2005043405 (FRITSCH DALE A [US], et al) | Examination | US2002172740 | by applicant | US4935250 | WO2004075653 | US6063414 | - LYTLE ET AL., NUTRITION AND CANCER, (1992), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 187 - 194 |