EP1941170 - MULTIMEMBERED CORE PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BorgWarner, Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2872 / US | [2010/25] |
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states Borgwarner, Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEATING, Martin, P. 14202 S. Manassas Ln. Plainfield, IL 60544 / US | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | Leckel, Ulf Leckel-Patentanwaltskanzlei Speyerer Straße 6 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Leckel, Ulf LECKEL Patentanwaltskanzlei Postfach 12 11 22 68062 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 06816340.1 | 05.10.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006US39016 | Priority number, date | US20050724546P | 06.10.2005 Original published format: US 724546 P | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007041683 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1941170 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1941170 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16D13/64, F16D65/12 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
F16D65/121 (EP,US);
F16D13/64 (KR);
F16D13/648 (EP,US);
F16D65/12 (KR);
F16D2065/1312 (EP,US);
F16D2200/0004 (EP,US);
F16D2250/00 (EP,US);
F16D2250/0023 (EP,US);
F16D2250/0076 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2010/25] |
Former [2009/03] | DE, FR, IT | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KERNPLATTE MIT MEHREREN GLIEDERN | [2008/28] | English: | MULTIMEMBERED CORE PLATE | [2008/28] | French: | PLAQUE À NOYAU MULTIÉLÉMENT | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 26.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3804213 (LUCIEN R, et al) [A] 1,12,17 * figure 2 *; | [A]GB931031 (DUNLOP RUBBER CO) [A] 1,12,17 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2003047285 (COLLIS DEAN A [US]) [A] 1,12,17 * figure 11; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0115211 (BORG WARNER [US]) [A] 1,12,17 * figure - * |