EP1940976 - METHOD OF FORMING MULTI-LAYER COATINGS ON AUTOMOBILE BODIES WITHOUT A PRIMER BAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRINDADE, Delson, J. 1802 Snowden Circle Rochester Hills, Michigan 48306 / US | 02 /
UHLIANUK, Peter, W. 6440 Bordman Road Romeo, Michigan 48065 / US | 03 /
YUAN, San, C. 8360 Woodspur Drive Commerce Township, Michigan 48382 / US | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | Axalta - Biering/Blum/Kimpel Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | DuPont Performance Coatings Biering/Blum/Kimpel Patentabteilung 102 JL Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2009/21] | DuPont Performance Coatings Biering/Blum/Kimpel Patentabteilung 102 JL Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2009/19] | Blum, Joachim, et al DuPont Performance Coatings GmbH & Co. KG Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Morf, Jan Stefan, et al Abitz & Partner Hörselbergstrasse 5 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06816678.4 | 10.10.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006US39646 | Priority number, date | US20050725013P | 07.10.2005 Original published format: US 725013 P | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007044769 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1940976 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1940976 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09D175/04, C08G18/62, C09D133/06, C09D5/00, B05D7/00 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
C09D175/04 (EP,US);
C09D133/06 (KR);
B05D7/00 (KR);
B05D7/572 (EP,US);
B05D7/577 (EP,US);
C08G18/62 (KR);
C08G18/6233 (EP,US);
C08G18/6254 (EP,US);
C08G18/631 (EP,US);
C09D133/062 (EP,US);
C09D5/00 (KR);
C09D5/002 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D133/062, C08L2666/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/28] | C09D5/00, B05D7/00, C08G18/62, C09D133/06 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [2008/48] |
Former [2008/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MEHRSCHICHTIGEN LACKIERUNG AUF AUTOMOBILKAROSSERIEN OHNE EINBRENNEN DES GRUNDIERMITTELS | [2008/28] | English: | METHOD OF FORMING MULTI-LAYER COATINGS ON AUTOMOBILE BODIES WITHOUT A PRIMER BAKE | [2008/28] | French: | PROCEDE DE FORMATION DE REVETEMENTS A COUCHES MULTIPLES SUR DES CARROSSERIES D'AUTOMOBILES SANS ETAPE DE CUISSON AU FOUR DE LA COUCHE PRIMAIRE | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 25.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.04.2012 | GB | 10.10.2012 | [2013/34] |
Former [2013/04] | BE | 04.04.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0119051 (GLASURIT AMERICA INC [US]) [X] 8-17 * page 1, lines 1-7 * * page 2, line 23 - page 7, line 21 * * page 11, line 19 - page 15, line 2 * * page 17, line 20 - page 18, line 3 * * page 21, line 9 - page 24, line 12; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0598280 (HERBERTS & CO GMBH [DE]) [X] 8-17 * page 2, lines 1-3 * * page 2, line 20 - page 7, line 52 ** page 8, line 8 - page 9, line 26; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP1201690 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 8-17 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] - [0067]; example -; claim - *; | [X]US2005161330 (TOI TERUZO [JP], et al) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] - [0027] - [0090] - [0093] - [0100] - [0112] - [0134]; claim - * |