EP1937756 - COATING FOR ENHANCING LOW TEMPERATURE HEAT SEALABILITY AND HIGH HOT TACK TO POLYMERIC SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICHELMAN, INC. 9080 Shell Road Cincinnati, OH 45236-1299 / US | [2008/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOPER, Robin Voie Des Pierres 279 B-6717 Attert XX / BE | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Crease, Devanand John, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | Crease, Devanand John, et al Keltie LLP Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | ||
Former [2008/27] | Crease, Devanand John, et al Keltie Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 06817130.5 | 13.10.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006US40749 | Priority number, date | US20050726380P | 13.10.2005 Original published format: US 726380 P | US20060819006P | 06.07.2006 Original published format: US 819006 P | US20060546672 | 12.10.2006 Original published format: US 546672 | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007044999 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1937756 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1937756 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, B32B7/12 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
B32B27/06 (EP,US);
B32B15/082 (EP,US);
B32B15/085 (EP,US);
B32B15/088 (EP,US);
B32B15/09 (EP,US);
B32B23/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/16 (EP,US);
B32B27/304 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/34 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/052 (EP,US);
C09D123/0869 (EP,US);
B32B2255/10 (EP,US);
B32B2255/20 (EP,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,US);
B32B2255/28 (EP,US);
B32B2307/31 (EP,US);
B32B2307/4023 (EP,US);
B32B2307/518 (EP,US);
B32B2435/02 (EP,US);
C08J2423/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/259 (EP,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3154 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3175 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31797 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31855 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31909 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER HEISSSIEGELFÄHIGKEIT BEI NIEDRIGER TEMPERATUR UND HOHER HEISSKLEBRIGKEIT AUF POLYMEREN SUBSTRATEN | [2008/27] | English: | COATING FOR ENHANCING LOW TEMPERATURE HEAT SEALABILITY AND HIGH HOT TACK TO POLYMERIC SUBSTRATES | [2008/27] | French: | REVÊTEMENT SERVANT À ACCROÎTRE L'APTITUDE AU THERMOSOUDAGE À BASSE TEMPÉRATURE ET À PRODUIRE UN COLLANT À CHAUD ÉLEVÉ À DES SUBSTRATS POLYMÉRIQUES | [2008/27] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 27.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.10.2006 | CY | 01.08.2012 | CZ | 01.08.2012 | DK | 01.08.2012 | EE | 01.08.2012 | FI | 01.08.2012 | LT | 01.08.2012 | LV | 01.08.2012 | PL | 01.08.2012 | RO | 01.08.2012 | SE | 01.08.2012 | SI | 01.08.2012 | SK | 01.08.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | BG | 01.11.2012 | GR | 02.11.2012 | ES | 12.11.2012 | IS | 01.12.2012 | PT | 03.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/34] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 01.08.2012 | |
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 01.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5958531 (STEVENSON JAMES A [US]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1035165 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [X] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2004160815 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-25* abstract * | by applicant | US5419960 | US6447899 |