EP1940279 - CHEMICAL WIPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aculon, Inc. 11839 Sorrento Valley Road San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2008/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUNER, Eric, L. 801 Ash Street 802 San Diego, CA 92101 / US | 02 /
HANSON, Eric L 7019 Gardenia Court Carlsbad, CA 92011 / US | 03 /
GRUBER, Gerald W. 8050 Manasota Key Road Englewood, Florida 34223 / US | [2008/34] |
Former [2008/28] | 01 /
BRUNER, Eric, L. 12614 Carmel Country Road 49 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | ||
02 /
HANSON, Eric L 11784 Carmel Creek Road B202 San Diego, California 92130 / US | |||
03 /
GRUBER, Gerald W. 8050 Manasota Key Road Englewood, Florida 34223 / US | Representative(s) | polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 06817279.0 | 24.10.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006US41258 | Priority number, date | US20050729631P | 24.10.2005 Original published format: US 729631 P | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007050500 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1940279 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A47L13/17, A47L13/19, B08B1/00, C11D17/04 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
A47L13/17 (EP,US);
C11D17/049 (EP,US);
C11D3/2075 (EP,US);
C11D3/36 (EP,US);
C11D3/361 (EP,US);
C11D7/265 (EP,US);
C11D7/36 (EP,US);
B05D1/28 (EP,US);
B05D7/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHEMISCHE WISCHTÜCHER | [2008/28] | English: | CHEMICAL WIPES | [2008/28] | French: | LINGETTES CHIMIQUES | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/51] | 21.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/51] | Divisional application(s) | EP08006588.1 / EP1955638 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5141803 (PREGOZEN DAVID [US]) [A] 1-27 * column 5; claim 1 *; | [A]US5464096 (HURWITZ ROBERT [US]) [A] 100-126* claim 1 *; | [A]US6121221 (DAVIS RONALD O [US]) [A] 100-126 * figure 1; claims 1,12,17 *; | [A]WO0204590 (EKC TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-27 * pages 7,13; claim 1 *; | [X]WO0236339 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1 * pages 8,10 *; | [A]US6716805 (SHERRY ALAN EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * paragraphs [0070] , [0071] * |