14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
11.11.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.12.2022 [2022/50] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
14.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
16.09.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] |
26.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
12.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
03.12.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] |
01.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.11.2021 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
25.10.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
25.10.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.10.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.10.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
25.10.2021 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
13.10.2021 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.05.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.05.2021 |
Change - inventor |
|
30.04.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
30.04.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
23.04.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
16.12.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.11.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.11.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.08.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.03.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.01.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.09.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.09.2018 |
Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.12.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.03.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] |
30.11.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.08.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] |
16.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.07.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.12.2013 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
13.12.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
14.10.2013 |
Deletion: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] |
21.04.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |
23.11.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.11.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.11.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.12.2008 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.11.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] |
14.11.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] |
12.11.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.10.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|