Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8385864 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2013 | B2 | US2009017784 | 15.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2006900854 | 21.02.2006 | WO2006AU01778 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5460057B | Global Dossier | 02.04.2014 | B2 | JP2009527778 | 30.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | AU2006900854 | 21.02.2006 | WO2006AU01778 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006338843B | Global Dossier | 05.04.2012 | B2 | AU2006338843 | 30.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2006338843 | 23.11.2006 | AU2006900854 | 21.02.2006 | WO2006AU01778 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2002542 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2022 | B1 | EP2002542 | 15.01.2014 | A4 | EP2002542 | 17.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2006900854 | 21.02.2006 | WO2006AU01778 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007095664 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2006900854 | 21.02.2006 |