EP2002542 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR LOW DELAY PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cirrus Logic International Semiconductor Limited 7B Nightingale Way Quartermile Edinburgh EH3 9EG / GB | [2017/16] |
Former [2016/37] | For all designated states Cirrus Logic International Semiconductor Limited Westfield House 26 Westfield Road Edinburgh EH11 2QB / GB | ||
Former [2012/21] | For all designated states Wolfson Dynamic Hearing Pty Ltd. 2 Chapel Street Richmond, VIC 3121 / AU | ||
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states DYNAMIC HEARING PTY LTD 2 Chapel Street Richmond, VIC 3121 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DICKSON, Bonar 6/368 Church Street Richmond, Victoria 3121 / AU | 02 /
STEELE, Brenton Robert 177 Blackburn Road Blackburn South, Victoria 3130 / AU | [2022/01] |
Former [2008/51] | 01 /
DICKSON, Bonar 6/368 Church Street Richmond, Victoria 3121 / AU | ||
02 /
STEELE, Brenton, Robert 177 Blackburn Road Blackburn South, Victoria 3130 / AU | Representative(s) | Millburn, Julie Elizabeth, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2022/01] |
Former [2008/51] | Robson, Aidan John Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 06817535.5 | 23.11.2006 | [2008/51] | WO2006AU01778 | Priority number, date | AU20060900854 | 21.02.2006 Original published format: AU 2006900854 | [2008/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007095664 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2002542 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2002542 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 30.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H03H17/02, G10L21/0364, // H04R25/00 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
G10L21/0364 (EP,US);
H03H21/0012 (US);
H03H17/0294 (EP);
H03H17/0211 (EP);
H03H17/0216 (US);
H03H21/0016 (US);
|
Former IPC [2014/03] | H03H21/00, // H03H17/02 | ||
Former IPC [2008/51] | H03H17/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2022/01] |
Former [2008/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR VERZÖGERUNGSARMEN VERARBEITUNG | [2008/51] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR LOW DELAY PROCESSING | [2008/51] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE FAIBLE RETARD | [2008/51] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 17.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 21.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 12.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 22.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2018 | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 22.10.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 22.10.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.10.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2006 | AT | 05.01.2022 | CY | 05.01.2022 | CZ | 05.01.2022 | DK | 05.01.2022 | EE | 05.01.2022 | ES | 05.01.2022 | FI | 05.01.2022 | IT | 05.01.2022 | LT | 05.01.2022 | LV | 05.01.2022 | MC | 05.01.2022 | NL | 05.01.2022 | PL | 05.01.2022 | RO | 05.01.2022 | SE | 05.01.2022 | SI | 05.01.2022 | SK | 05.01.2022 | TR | 05.01.2022 | BG | 05.04.2022 | GR | 06.04.2022 | IS | 05.05.2022 | PT | 05.05.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/21] | HU | 23.11.2006 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
IT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 23.11.2006 | |
AT | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
IT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
IT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
FI | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 05.01.2022 | |
ES | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 05.01.2022 | |
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
SE | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 05.01.2022 | |
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 05.01.2022 | |
NL | 05.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 05.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5511014 (MOUROT CHRISTOPHE [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** column 2, line 62 - column 7, line 25; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO03015468 (GN RESOUND AS [DK]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, line 9 - line 23; figure 3 *; | [Y] - Grace A. Clark, "Phase Retrieval from Modulus Using Homeomorphic Signal Processing and the Complex Cepstrum: An Algorithm for Lightning Protection Systems", (20040608), URL: https://e-reports-ext.llnl.gov/pdf/308517.pdf, (20131211), XP055092825 [Y] 1-7,9-15 * page 7 - page 17; figure 2.1 * * page 18 - page 21; figure 3.1 * | [YA] - CHIT N N ET AL, "DESIGN OF MINIMUM PHASE FIR DIGITAL FILTERS", IEE PROCEEDINGS G. ELECTRONIC CIRCUITS & SYSTEMS, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS. STEVENAGE, GB, (19881201), vol. 135, no. 6, PART G, ISSN 0622-0039, pages 258 - 264, XP000094728 [Y] 1-3,9-15 * abstract * * 1 Introduction; page 258, column l - column r * * 5 MPH specifications; page 260, column r - page 261, column l * [A] 4-8 | [YA] - FOTINOPOULOS I ET AL, "EQUIRIPPLE MINIMUM PHASE FIR FILTER DESIGN FROM LINEAR PHASE SYSTEMS USING A NOVEL TECHNIQUE FOR POLYNOMIAL FACTORISATION", GLOBECOM'00. 2000 IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. SAN FRANCISCO, CA, NOV. 27 - DEC. 1, 2000; [IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20001127), vol. 3, ISBN 978-0-7803-6452-3, pages 1659 - 1663, XP001195712 [Y] 1,2,8-11,13,14 * abstract * * I. Introduction; page 1659, column l - column r * [A] 3-7,12,15 | International search | [A]WO9116769 (DOLBY LAB LICENSING CORP [US]); | [A]WO9608879 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA STATE [US], et al); | [A]US5680393 (BOURMEYSTER IVAN [FR], et al); | [A]EP1271472 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]); | [A]WO03015464 (DSP FACTORY LTD [CA], et al); | [A]US2003187637 (KANG HONG-GOO [US], et al); | [X] - JEONG-HYEON YUN ET AL., "Subband Active Noise Control Algorithm Based on a Delayless Subband Adaptive Filter Architecture", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, (1997), vol. 1, pages 391 - 394, XP010226217 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1997.599655 | [X] - MORGAN D.R. ET AL., "A Delayless Subband Adaptive Filter Architecture", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, (199508), vol. 43, no. 8, pages 1819 - 1829, XP008130736 | [A] - MERCHED R. ET AL., "A New Delayless Subband Adaptive Filter Structure", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, (199906), vol. 47, no. 6, pages 1580 - 1591, XP008126876 | [A] - DIETHORN E.J., "A Low-Complexity, Background-Noise Reduction Preprocessor For Speech Encoders", SPEECH CODING FOR TELECOMMUNICATIONS PROCEEDINGS, 1997, 1997 IEEE WORKSHOP, POCONO MANOR, PA, USA, (19970907), XP008130737 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SCFT.1997.623888 | by applicant | - AV OPPENHEIM; DH JOHNSON; K STEIGLITZ, "Computation of spectra with unequal resolution using the Fast Fourier Transform", Proc. IEEE, (19710200), vol. 59, pages 299 - 301 |