EP1960757 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR AUTOMATED ASSESSMENT OF TISSUE PATHOLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Columbia Cancer Agency Branch 600 West 10th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V5Z 4E6 / CA | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACAULAY, Calum, E. 338 East 37th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V5W 1E7 / CA | 02 /
GUILLAUD, Martial, Daniel 1950 Matthews Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V6J 2T7 / CA | 03 /
ROSIN, Miriam, Pearl 160 Aspenwood Drive Port Moody, British Columbia V3H 5A5 / CA | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Leihkauf, Steffen Falk, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Leihkauf, Steffen Falk, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06817663.5 | 27.11.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006CA01933 | Priority number, date | US20050739412P | 25.11.2005 Original published format: US 739412 P | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007059629 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1960757 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 31.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/00, C12M1/34, C12Q1/00, G01N15/02, G01N21/84, G01N33/483, G06F19/00, G06T7/40, G01N1/30 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G01N33/5091 (EP,US);
G01N33/574 (EP,US);
G06V20/698 (EP,US);
G01N1/30 (EP,US);
G01N15/1433 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30024 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN BEURTEILUNG EINES GEWEBEKRANKHEITSBILDS | [2008/35] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR AUTOMATED ASSESSMENT OF TISSUE PATHOLOGY | [2008/35] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDES D'EVALUATION AUTOMATISEE D'UNE PATHOLOGIE TISSULAIRE | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 01.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/49] | 13.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.12.2008 | 30.11.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - MATTIE M.E. ET AL., "Content-based Cell Image Retrieval Using Automated Feature Extraction", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN MEDICAL INFORMATICS ASSOCIATION, (200007), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 404 - 415, XP003013930 | [X] - POULIN N. ET AL., "Histometric Texture Analysis of DNA in Thin Sections from Breast Biopsies", ANALYTICAL AND QUANTITATIVE CYTOLOGY AND HISTOLOGY, (199510), vol. 17, no. 5, pages 291 - 299, XP008083030 | [Y] - HENDERSON Z. ET AL., "Development of Ganglion Cell Topography in Ferret Retina", THE JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (198804), pages 1194 - 1205, XP003013931 | [Y] - RAIMONDO F. ET AL., "Automated Evaluation of Her - 2/neu Status in Breast Tissue from Fluorescent In Situ Hybridization Images", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, (200509), vol. 14, no. 9, pages 1288 - 1299, XP011137566 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIP.2005.852806 | [Y] - BOUSTANY N. ET AL., "Calcium Induced alterations in Mitochondrial Morphology Quantified in Situ with Optical Scatter Imaging", BIOPHYSICAL JOURNAL, (200209), vol. 83, pages 1691 - 1700, XP003013932 |