EP1969101 - METHODS FOR CONCENTRATION AND EXTRACTION OF LUBRICITY COMPOUNDS AND BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE FRACTIONS FROM NATURALLY DERIVED FATS, OILS AND GREASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Her Majesty in Right of Canada, represented by The Minister of Agriculture and Agri-Food Canada 930 Carling Avenue Ottawa Ontario K1A OC5 / CA | [2008/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REANEY, Martin, J. 307 Budz Terrace Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7N 4M5 / CA | 02 /
PIETTE, Gabriel 10255 d'lberville Montreal, Québec H2B 2T7 / CA | 03 /
HERTZ, Phillip, Barry 2 Rutter Crescent Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7H 3B7 / CA | 04 /
WESTCOTT, Neil, D. 170 Mount Alison Crescent Saskatoon, Saskatchewan S7H 4A5 / CA | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Popp, Eugen Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/38] | Popp, Eugen MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06817666.8 | 30.11.2006 | [2008/38] | WO2006CA01938 | Priority number, date | US20050290781 | 01.12.2005 Original published format: US 290781 | US20060600747 | 17.11.2006 Original published format: US 600747 | [2008/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007062512 | Date: | 07.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1969101 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 07.06.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/18, C10M159/02, C10M177/00, C11B1/10, C11C3/04, // C10N30/06, C10N40/25, C10N70/00 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
C10M177/00 (EP,US);
C10L1/1802 (EP,US);
C10L1/1817 (EP,US);
C10L1/19 (EP,US);
C10L10/08 (EP,US);
C10M105/34 (EP,US);
C10M159/02 (EP,US);
C10M159/08 (EP,US);
C11B1/06 (EP,US);
C11B1/10 (EP,US);
C11B3/001 (EP,US);
C11C3/003 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/38] | C10M109/00, C10L1/18, C10M177/00, C11B1/10, C11C3/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM KONZENTRIEREN UND EXTRAHIEREN VON SCHMIERVERBINDUNGEN UND BIOLOGISCH WIRKSAMEN FRAKTIONEN AUS FETTEN, ÖLEN UND SCHMIERFETTEN NATÜRLICHEN URSPRUNGS | [2008/38] | English: | METHODS FOR CONCENTRATION AND EXTRACTION OF LUBRICITY COMPOUNDS AND BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE FRACTIONS FROM NATURALLY DERIVED FATS, OILS AND GREASES | [2008/38] | French: | PROCEDES POUR LA CONCENTRATION ET L'EXTRACTION DE COMPOSES DE POUVOIR LUBRIFIANT ET DE FRACTIONS BIOLOGIQUEMENT ACTIVES A PARTIR DE MATIERES GRASSES, D'HUILES ET DE GRAISSES D'ORIGINE NATURELLE | [2008/38] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 24.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/52] | 11.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005051294 (CAROTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-8,10-14 * abstract * * page 4, line 13 - page 7, line 9 *; | [A]US5660691 (BARNICKI SCOTT DONALD [US], et al) [A] 1-8,10-14 * abstract * * column 1, lines 10-41 * * example 1 *; | [A]US2098254 (MATTILL HENRY A, et al) [A] 1-8,10-14 * pages 1-2 * | [X] - ALFRED THOMAS, "Fats and Fatty Oils", ULLMANN'S ENCYCLOPEDIA OF INDUSTRIAL CHEMISTRY,, (20000615), pages 1 - 73, XP007909584 [X] 1-8,10-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/14356007.a10_173 | [A] - YOMI WATANABE ET AL, "Purification of Tocopherols and Phytosterols by a Two-Step in situ Enzymatic Reaction", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20040401), vol. 81, no. 4, ISSN 0003-021X, pages 339 - 345, XP007909585 [A] 1-8,10-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11746-004-0904-9 | International search | [Y]US5599358 (GIAVAZZI FULVIO [IT], et al); | [Y]US6113971 (ELMALEH DAVID R [US]) |