EP1957813 - ROLLING BEARING WITH HEATING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2015/10] |
Former [2014/12] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLÜCK, Stefan Wilhelm-Bechert-Strasse 20 97424 Schweinfurt / DE | [2008/34] | Application number, filing date | 06818119.7 | 05.12.2006 | [2008/34] | WO2006DE02151 | Priority number, date | DE20051058141 | 06.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005058141 | [2008/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007065412 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1957813 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/58, F16C35/067 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
F16C35/067 (EP,US);
F16C33/586 (EP,US);
F16C35/063 (EP,US);
F16C19/06 (EP,US);
Y10S384/90 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49707 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Title | German: | WÄLZLAGER MIT HEIZELEMENT | [2008/34] | English: | ROLLING BEARING WITH HEATING ELEMENT | [2008/34] | French: | PALIER A ROULEMENT AVEC ELEMENT CHAUFFANT | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 20.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/25] | 24.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.04.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 06.04.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   06.04.2013 | 31.12.2013 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   19.03.2014 | 31.12.2016 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2474267 (EST SARL ELECTRO MECANIQUE [FR]) [A] 12* the whole document *; | [XAI]DE20001339U (OVERMEYER ALBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 1; claims 8-11 * * page 5, line 19 - page 6, line 10 * * page 8, lines 10-29 * [A] 3,4,6,7,9,11 [I] 2,5,8,10 | Examination | JPH0314912 |