EP2086451 - DEVICE FOR SECURING A DENTAL ATTACHMENT TO AN IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dentsply Implants NV Research Campus 10 3500 Hasselt / BE | [2014/20] |
Former [2009/33] | For all designated states Materialise Dental N.V. Technologielaan 15 3001 Leuven / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN LIERDE, Carl Brusselsesteenweg 560 B-9402 Meerbeke / BE | 02 /
ESPOSTI, Alessio Kattenberg 1 B-1170 Watermael-Boitsfort / BE | [2017/06] |
Former [2009/33] | 01 /
VAN LIERDE, Carl Brusselsesteenweg 560 B-9402 Meerbeke / BE | ||
02 /
ESPOSTI, Alessio Kattenberg 1 B-1170 Watemael-Boitsfort / BE | Representative(s) | Beck, Michaël Andries T. IPLodge Technologielaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/06] | Beck, Michaël Andries T. IPLodge bvba Technologielaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | ||
Former [2013/31] | Beck, Michaël Andries T. IPLodge Bondgenotenlaan 93/5 3000 Leuven / BE | ||
Former [2009/33] | Bird, William Edward Bird Goën & Co. Klein Dalenstraat 42A 3020 Winksele / BE | Application number, filing date | 06818361.5 | 03.11.2006 | [2009/33] | WO2006EP10557 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008052586 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2086451 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2086451 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00, A61C1/08 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
A61C8/005 (EP,US);
A61C1/084 (EP,US);
A61C8/0054 (EP,US);
A61C8/006 (EP,US);
A61C8/0068 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/33] | A61C8/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/06] |
Former [2009/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINER DENTALEN STÜTZE AUF EINEM IMPLANTAT | [2016/36] | English: | DEVICE FOR SECURING A DENTAL ATTACHMENT TO AN IMPLANT | [2009/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR FIXER UNE FIXATION DENTAIRE SUR UN IMPLANT | [2009/33] |
Former [2009/33] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR FIXIERUNG EINER ZAHNBEFESTIGUNG AN EINEM IMPLANTAT | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 17.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.09.2016 | 19.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 03.06.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.11.2006 | AT | 08.02.2017 | CY | 08.02.2017 | CZ | 08.02.2017 | DK | 08.02.2017 | EE | 08.02.2017 | ES | 08.02.2017 | FI | 08.02.2017 | LT | 08.02.2017 | LV | 08.02.2017 | MC | 08.02.2017 | NL | 08.02.2017 | PL | 08.02.2017 | RO | 08.02.2017 | SI | 08.02.2017 | SK | 08.02.2017 | TR | 08.02.2017 | BG | 08.05.2017 | GR | 09.05.2017 | IS | 08.06.2017 | PT | 08.06.2017 | IE | 03.11.2017 | LU | 03.11.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 03.11.2006 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
TR | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
IE | 03.11.2017 | ||
LU | 03.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 03.11.2006 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
IE | 03.11.2017 | ||
LU | 03.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 03.11.2006 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
IE | 03.11.2017 | ||
LU | 03.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
IE | 03.11.2017 | ||
LU | 03.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
LU | 03.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1607063 (UNOR AG UNOR SA UNOR LTD [CH]) [X] 1,6,20,23,28,32 * paragraph [0026]; figure 5 *; | [X]AT375012B (BUERMOOS DENTALWERK [AT]) [X] 1,23,28,32 * page 3, line 7 - line 38 *; | [XA]WO9749351 (MEDEVELOP AB [SE], et al) [X] 24,25,27 * page 5 - page 8; figures 6,7,9 * [A] 26; | [XA]EP0583829 (ALPHADENT N V [BE]) [X] 24 * column 4, line 45 - column 6, line 44 * [A] 1,4,8; | [X]US2004142300 (ARAVENA INES MONICA [US]) [X] 24,27 * paragraphs [0056] , [0064] , [0068]; figures 13-15,17,19 *; | [X]FR2623999 (BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [X] 24 * page 7, line 21 - page 10, line 18 *; | [XA]WO02062257 (ACCIUS BV [NL], et al) [X] 24 * page 9, line 1 - line 16 * * page 11, line 5 - page 12, line 12 * [A] 8,16,25; | [X]EP1205159 (GERMANIER YVES [CH]) [X] 21,22,27 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0028] * |