EP1948481 - INFORMATION DEVICE, PREFERABLY IN A MOTOR VEHICLE, AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING INFORMATION CONCERNING VEHICLE DATA, PARTICULARLY VEHICLE FUNCTIONS AND THE OPERATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Volkswagen AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Volkswagen AG 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÄLLER, Christoph Jasperallee 52 38102 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
WU, Yongmei Georg-Friedrich-Händel-Str. 14 38442 Wolfsburg / DE | 03 /
BOHNENBERGER, Thorsten Frankfurter Str. 24 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner Radickestrasse 48 12489 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 06818415.9 | 08.11.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006EP10700 | Priority number, date | DE20051053978 | 11.11.2005 Original published format: DE102005053978 | DE20061006338 | 11.02.2006 Original published format: DE102006006338 | [2008/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007054284 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1948481 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1948481 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/037, B60K37/00 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
G01C21/36 (EP,US);
B60R16/037 (KR);
B60K35/00 (EP,US);
B60K35/10 (EP,US);
B60K35/28 (EP,US);
B60K37/00 (KR);
B60R16/02 (KR);
B60K2360/143 (EP,US);
B60K2360/1438 (EP,US);
B60K2360/161 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSEINRICHTUNG, VORZUGSWEISE IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG, UND VERFAHREN ZUR INFORMATION ÜBER FAHRZEUGDATEN, INSBESONDERE FAHRZEUGFUNKTIONEN UND DEREN BEDIENUNG | [2008/31] | English: | INFORMATION DEVICE, PREFERABLY IN A MOTOR VEHICLE, AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING INFORMATION CONCERNING VEHICLE DATA, PARTICULARLY VEHICLE FUNCTIONS AND THE OPERATION THEREOF | [2008/31] | French: | SYSTEME D'INFORMATION SITUE DE PREFERENCE DANS UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE, ET PROCEDE POUR FOURNIR DES INFORMATIONS PAR L'INTERMEDIAIRE DE DONNEES RELATIVES AU VEHICULE, EN PARTICULIER AUX FONCTIONS DU VEHICULE ET A LEUR UTILISATION | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.02.2010 | CZ | 17.02.2010 | DK | 17.02.2010 | EE | 17.02.2010 | FI | 17.02.2010 | IE | 17.02.2010 | LT | 17.02.2010 | LV | 17.02.2010 | NL | 17.02.2010 | PL | 17.02.2010 | RO | 17.02.2010 | SE | 17.02.2010 | SI | 17.02.2010 | SK | 17.02.2010 | TR | 17.02.2010 | BG | 17.05.2010 | GR | 18.05.2010 | ES | 28.05.2010 | IS | 17.06.2010 | PT | 17.06.2010 | HU | 18.08.2010 | LU | 08.11.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
HU | 18.08.2010 | ||
LU | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
HU | 18.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | FI | 17.02.2010 | |
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | FI | 17.02.2010 | |
LT | 17.02.2010 | ||
LV | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
IS | 17.06.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | ES | 28.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0893308 (EQUOS RESEARCH KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,12-14 * column 26, line 56 - column 27, line 13 * [A] 4-11,15-22; | [A]US6401029 (KUBOTA TOMOKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-22 * column 13, line 38 - line 53 * * column 7, line 66 - column 8, line 1 ** column 4, line 35 - line 36 *; | [A]EP1431127 (EQUOS RESEARCH KK [JP]) [A] 1-22 * claim 4 *; | [A]EP1462317 (EQUOS RESEARCH KK [JP]) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0212] * | by applicant | EP0893308 | DE102005002277 |