09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
10.04.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.05.2020 [2020/20] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
10.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
03.05.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
26.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
26.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.02.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.01.2019 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
26.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.07.2018 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
30.05.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.02.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.11.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.03.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
25.11.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.01.2016 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.11.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.11.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.12.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.11.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] |
08.05.2012 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
04.05.2012 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
04.05.2012 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
28.04.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.02.2012 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.11.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.11.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.06.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.11.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.07.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
01.12.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.06.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.05.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.03.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.11.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.11.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] |
12.11.2008 |
First examination report |
|
11.11.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.10.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.09.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] |
26.09.2008 |
Change - inventor |
published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] |
08.08.2008 |
Change - inventor |
published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] |
27.06.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
27.06.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
19.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.12.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|