Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8138750 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2012 | B2 | US2009079420 | 26.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006EP10811 | 10.11.2006 | DE102005054257 | 11.11.2005 | DE102006002221 | 16.01.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1949034 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2019 | B1 | EP1949034 | 30.07.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006EP10811 | 10.11.2006 | DE102005054257 | 11.11.2005 | DE102006002221 | 16.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007054344 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2007 | A3 | WO2007054344 | 18.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102005054257 | 11.11.2005 | DE102006002221 | 16.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102006002221 | 24.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005054257 | 11.11.2005 | DE102006002221 | 16.01.2006 |