EP1948955 - METHOD FOR THE ASSEMBLY OF A WEAR INDICATOR ON A BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2014 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pex Kabeltechnik GmbH Hertzstrasse 6 71083 Herrenberg-Gülstein / DE | [2008/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOHLER, Hartmut Alte Poststr. 28 72285 Pfälzgrafenweiler / DE | 02 /
SCHÖCK, Marco Heckengäustrasse 10 71272 Renningen / DE | 03 /
KORECKI, Jörg Würmhalde 4 71134 Aidlingen / DE | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2014/03] |
Former [2008/45] | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Weiss, Peter Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06818590.9 | 16.11.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006EP11002 | Priority number, date | DE20051055536 | 18.11.2005 Original published format: DE102005055536 | [2008/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007057184 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1948955 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1948955 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16D66/02 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
F16D66/024 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINES VERSCHLEISSANZEIGERS AN EINER BREMSE | [2008/31] | English: | METHOD FOR THE ASSEMBLY OF A WEAR INDICATOR ON A BRAKE | [2008/31] | French: | PROCEDE DE MONTAGE D'UN INDICATEUR D'USURE SUR UN FREIN | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 04.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.03.2010
ADMISSIBLE BOWA-electronic GmbH & Co. KG Heinrich-Hertz-Str. 4-10 72810 Gomaringen / DE Opponent's representative Schneider, Peter Christian Fiedler, Ostermann & Schneider Patentanwälte Obere Karspüle 41 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.03.2010
ADMISSIBLE BOWA-electronic GmbH & Co. KG Heinrich-Hertz-Str. 4-10 72810 Gomaringen / DE Opponent's representative Schneider, Peter Christian Fiedler, Ostermann & Schneider Patentanwälte Obere Karspüle 41 37073 Göttingen / DE | 18.08.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.12.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 21.06.2014 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2014/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 30.09.2011 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2013/36] | 02.12.2013 | Resumption of proceedings | [2013/36] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.10.2009 | CZ | 14.10.2009 | DK | 14.10.2009 | EE | 14.10.2009 | FI | 14.10.2009 | IE | 14.10.2009 | LT | 14.10.2009 | LV | 14.10.2009 | NL | 14.10.2009 | RO | 14.10.2009 | SE | 14.10.2009 | SI | 14.10.2009 | TR | 14.10.2009 | AT | 16.11.2009 | LU | 16.11.2009 | BE | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | BG | 14.01.2010 | GR | 15.01.2010 | IS | 14.02.2010 | PT | 15.02.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | GB | 16.11.2011 | IT | 16.11.2011 | PL | 16.11.2011 | SK | 16.11.2011 | ES | 17.11.2011 | HU | 17.11.2011 | FR | 30.11.2011 | DE | 01.06.2012 | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/30] | CY | 14.10.2009 | |
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
NL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
TR | 14.10.2009 | ||
AT | 16.11.2009 | ||
LU | 16.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
GB | 16.11.2011 | ||
IT | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
HU | 17.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
DE | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2011/41] | CY | 14.10.2009 | |
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
TR | 14.10.2009 | ||
AT | 16.11.2009 | ||
LU | 16.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 14.10.2009 | |
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
AT | 16.11.2009 | ||
IT | 16.11.2009 | ||
LU | 16.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | CZ | 14.10.2009 | |
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
AT | 16.11.2009 | ||
IT | 16.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CZ | 14.10.2009 | |
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | CZ | 14.10.2009 | |
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | FI | 14.10.2009 | |
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | FI | 14.10.2009 | |
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2266056 (CAMA MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X]DE3230266 (TEXTAR GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-9 * figures 3,4 *; | [X]US5839545 (PRESTON DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * figures 3-7 *; | [X]US2002014959 (LUDTKE PETER JOHANNES [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * figures 1,11,12 * |