Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP1948132 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2006322314 EP06818692 EP2006011131W KR20087014676 US56173706



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8148393Global Dossier 03.04.2012B2
US2007166380 19.07.2007A1
Priority number Date
US56173706 20.11.2006
US73781105 18.11.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101345468BGlobal Dossier 30.12.2013B1
KR20080073342 08.08.2008A
Priority number Date
US73781105 18.11.2005
WO2006EP11131 20.11.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2006322314Global Dossier 14.06.2007A1
Priority number Date
US73781105 18.11.2005
WO2006EP11131 20.11.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1948132Global Dossier 05.08.2009B1
EP1948132 30.07.2008A1
Priority number Date
US73781105 18.11.2005
WO2006EP11131 20.11.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ATE438381T 15.08.2009T1
Priority number Date
US73781105 18.11.2005
WO2006EP11131 20.11.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2629740 14.06.2007A1
Priority number Date
US73781105 18.11.2005
WO2006EP11131 20.11.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE602006008339D1 17.09.2009D1
Priority number Date
US73781105 18.11.2005
WO2006EP11131 20.11.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2007065559Global Dossier 14.06.2007A1
Priority number Date
US73781105 18.11.2005