EP1937741 - MOISTURE-HARDENED POLYURETHANE COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING COMPOUNDS COMPRISING ALDIMINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2008/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURCKHARDT, Urs Ackersteinstrasse 207 CH-8049 Zürich / CH | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Tüffenwies 16 Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 06819065.1 | 29.09.2006 | [2008/27] | WO2006EP66927 | Priority number, date | EP20050109112 | 30.09.2005 Original published format: EP 05109112 | [2008/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007036574 | Date: | 05.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1937741 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1937741 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/32, C08G18/10, C09D175/04, C09K3/10, C09J175/04 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
C09K3/1021 (EP,US);
C09J175/04 (KR);
C08G18/0885 (EP,US);
C08G18/089 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/3256 (EP,US);
C08G18/12, C08G18/289 (US,EP);
C08G18/12, C08G18/3256 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEUCHTIGKEITSHÄRTENDE POLYURETHANZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND ALDIMIN-HALTIGE VERBINDUNGEN | [2010/27] | English: | MOISTURE-HARDENED POLYURETHANE COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING COMPOUNDS COMPRISING ALDIMINE | [2008/27] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE POLYURETHANE DURCISSANT A L'HUMIDITE QUI COMPRENNENT DES COMPOSES CONTENANT DES ALDIMINES | [2008/27] |
Former [2008/27] | FEUCHTIGKEITSHARTENDE POLYURETHANZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND ALDIMIN-HALTIGE VERBINDUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 07.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 25.08.2009 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 02.09.2009 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/41] | 11.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/41] | 02.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 03.11.2010 | CY | 03.11.2010 | CZ | 03.11.2010 | EE | 03.11.2010 | FI | 03.11.2010 | IE | 03.11.2010 | LT | 03.11.2010 | LV | 03.11.2010 | PL | 03.11.2010 | RO | 03.11.2010 | SI | 03.11.2010 | SK | 03.11.2010 | TR | 03.11.2010 | GR | 04.02.2011 | IS | 03.03.2011 | PT | 03.03.2011 | [2014/38] |
Former [2014/34] | CY | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
TR | 03.11.2010 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
TR | 03.11.2010 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CZ | 03.11.2010 | |
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | FI | 03.11.2010 | |
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | FI | 03.11.2010 | |
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 03.11.2010 | |
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 03.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0469751 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5087661 (AOKI MASAAKI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-25* the whole document *; | [AD]US6136942 (PFENNINGER UELI [CH], et al) [AD] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1384735 (SIKA TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1524282 (SIKA TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document * |