18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
11.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
16.11.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] |
09.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
02.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
26.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
07.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
24.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
10.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
27.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
20.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
13.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] |
18.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] |
09.12.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] |
06.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.11.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.11.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.07.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.12.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.06.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.04.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.12.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.11.2009 |
First examination report |
|
25.11.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.12.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.07.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
25.07.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
04.07.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.07.2008 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
04.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.10.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|