EP1957784 - THREE-PASS HEAT EXCHANGER FOR AN EGR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dytech Ensa, S.L. Carretera de Zamanes 20 36315 Vigo, Pontevedra / ES | [2009/24] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states Dayco Ensa, S.L. Carretera De Zamanes 20 36315 Vigo Pontevedra / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASTAÑO GONZÁLEZ, Carlos Manuel C/Costa Castrelos, 2-P, 2·B E-36314 Vigo / ES | 02 /
GRANDE FERNÁNDEZ, José Antonio C/Aragón, 221, 2·C E-36210 Vigo / ES | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Franzolin, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Franzolin, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 06819658.3 | 22.11.2006 | [2008/34] | WO2006EP68742 | Priority number, date | ES20050002863 | 22.11.2005 Original published format: ES 200502863 | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007060172 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1957784 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1957784 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/07 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
F28F27/02 (EP,ES,US);
F02D21/08 (ES);
F02M26/26 (EP,US);
F02M26/32 (EP,US);
F28D7/1638 (EP,US);
F28D7/1676 (EP,ES,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 3-ZUG-WÄRMETAUSCHER FÜR EIN AGR-SYSTEM | [2008/34] | English: | THREE-PASS HEAT EXCHANGER FOR AN EGR SYSTEM | [2008/34] | French: | ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR A TROIS PASSES POUR SYSTEME DE RECIRCULATION DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 22.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08165549.0 / EP2025913 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.06.2009 | BE | 17.06.2009 | CY | 17.06.2009 | DK | 17.06.2009 | EE | 17.06.2009 | FI | 17.06.2009 | GR | 17.06.2009 | LT | 17.06.2009 | LV | 17.06.2009 | NL | 17.06.2009 | SI | 17.06.2009 | SK | 17.06.2009 | BG | 17.09.2009 | IS | 17.10.2009 | PT | 17.10.2009 | IE | 22.11.2009 | LU | 22.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | HU | 18.12.2009 | [2014/38] |
Former [2011/45] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
BE | 17.06.2009 | ||
CY | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
IE | 22.11.2009 | ||
LU | 22.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
HU | 18.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
BE | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
IE | 22.11.2009 | ||
LU | 22.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
HU | 18.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
BE | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
IE | 22.11.2009 | ||
LU | 22.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
BE | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
IE | 22.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
BE | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
BE | 17.06.2009 | ||
DK | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
BE | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
BG | 17.09.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
PT | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
BE | 17.06.2009 | ||
EE | 17.06.2009 | ||
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
NL | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | ||
SK | 17.06.2009 | ||
IS | 17.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 17.06.2009 | |
FI | 17.06.2009 | ||
LT | 17.06.2009 | ||
LV | 17.06.2009 | ||
SI | 17.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH360844 (HALBERGERHUETTE GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4660632 (YAMPOLSKY JACK S [US], et al); | [A]EP0864830 (BORSIG BABCOCK AG [DE]); | [A]EP0930429 (STEYR NUTZFAHRZEUGE [AT]); | [X]DE19936241 (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]); | [A]WO03062625 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al); | [A]WO03098026 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al); | [A]EP1367253 (ESTAMPACIONES NOROESTE S A [ES]); | [A]FR2852678 (VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR SA [FR]) |