EP1957041 - OIL-IN-WATER EMULSION AND ITS USE FOR THE DELIVERY OF FUNCTIONALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, HU, IE, LI, LU, TR | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAGALOWICZ, Laurent Rte de Grandvaux 18b CH-1096 Cully / CH | 02 /
LESER, Martin Ch. du Champ Petau 36 CH-1053 Bretigny / CH | 03 /
MICHEL, Martin Ch. de Verdonnet 12 CH-1010 Lausanne / CH | 04 /
WATZKE, Heribert Johann Chemin de la Fauvette 30e CH-1012 Lausanne / CH | 05 /
ACQUISTAPACE, Simone Rte de Chailly 2 CH-1014 La Tour-de-Peilz / CH | 06 /
BERTHOLET, Raymond Ch. Vers-chez-Cochard 11 CH-1807 Blonay / CH | 07 /
HOLST, Birgit Route du Mont Pélerin 18 CH-1805 Jongny / CH | 08 /
ROBERT, Fabien Rue de Lausanne 80 F F-01220 Divonne les Bains / FR | [2010/33] |
Former [2008/34] | 01 /
SAGALOWICZ, Laurent Rte de Grandvaux 18b CH-1096 Cully / CH | ||
02 /
LESER, Martin Ch. du Champ Petau 36 Ch-1053 Bretigny / CH | |||
03 /
MICHEL, Martin Ch. de Verdonnet 12 CH-1010 Lausanne / CH | |||
04 /
WATZKE, Heribert Johann Chemin de la Fauvette 30e CH-1012 Lausanne / CH | |||
05 /
ACQUISTAPACE, Simone Rte de Chailly 2 CH-1014 La Tour-de-Peilz / CH | |||
06 /
BERTHOLET, Raymond Ch. Vers-chez-Cochard 11 CH-1807 Blonay / CH | |||
07 /
HOLST, Birgit Route du Mont Pélerin 18 CH-1805 Jongny / CH | |||
08 /
ROBERT, Fabien Rue de Lausanne 80 F F-01220 Divonne les Bains / FR | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/20] |
Former [2008/34] | Thomas, Alain Nestec S.A., 55, avenue Nestlé 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 06819669.0 | 22.11.2006 | [2008/34] | WO2006EP68761 | Priority number, date | EP20050025439 | 22.11.2005 Original published format: EP 05025439 | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007060177 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1957041 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1957041 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/113, A61K9/107, A23L1/22, A61K8/06 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
A23L27/80 (EP,US);
A23L33/11 (EP,US);
A23L33/12 (EP,US);
A23L33/15 (EP,US);
A61K8/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/062 (EP,US);
A61K8/068 (EP,US);
A61K9/1075 (EP,US);
A61K9/113 (EP,US);
A61K9/1274 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/222, A23V2250/194, A23V2250/21, A23V2250/192 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÖL-IN-WASSER-EMULSION UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR ABGABE EINER FUNKTIONALITÄT | [2008/34] | English: | OIL-IN-WATER EMULSION AND ITS USE FOR THE DELIVERY OF FUNCTIONALITY | [2008/34] | French: | EMULSION D'HUILE DANS L'EAU ET SON UTILISATION DANS L'ADMINISTRATION D'UNE FONCTIONNALITE | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 28.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.05.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2011
07.06.2011
ADMISSIBLE Friesland Brands B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative Jansen, Cornelis Marinus V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | 02
18.05.2011
07.06.2011
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Krömer-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Patent Department Division Medical Devices Else-Kröner-Straße 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2011
07.06.2011
ADMISSIBLE Friesland Brands B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative Jansen, Cornelis Marinus V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
02
18.05.2011
07.06.2011
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Krömer-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Patent Department Else-Kröner-Straße 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | |||
Former [2013/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2011
07.06.2011
ADMISSIBLE Friesland Brands B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative Jansen, Cornelis Marinus Vereenigde N.V. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
02
18.05.2011
07.06.2011
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Krömer-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | |||
Former [2011/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2011
07.06.2011
ADMISSIBLE Friesland Brands B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative Jansen, Cornelis Marinus Vereenigde N.V. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
02
18.05.2011
07.06.2011
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Krömer-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Richly, Erik, et al, et al Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Patent Department Else-Kröner-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | |||
Former [2011/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.05.2011
ADMISSIBLE Friesland Brands B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL Opponent's representative Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al, et al Vereenigde N.V. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | 01.07.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.01.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.04.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.06.2013 | 06.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 16.05.2013 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/39] | 11.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2010 | BE | 18.08.2010 | CH | 18.08.2010 | CY | 18.08.2010 | CZ | 18.08.2010 | DK | 18.08.2010 | EE | 18.08.2010 | FI | 18.08.2010 | LI | 18.08.2010 | LT | 18.08.2010 | LV | 18.08.2010 | RO | 18.08.2010 | SE | 18.08.2010 | SI | 18.08.2010 | SK | 18.08.2010 | TR | 18.08.2010 | BG | 18.11.2010 | GR | 19.11.2010 | IE | 22.11.2010 | LU | 22.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | IS | 18.12.2010 | PT | 20.12.2010 | HU | 19.02.2011 | [2013/48] |
Former [2011/29] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
BE | 18.08.2010 | ||
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2004008837 ; | [DX]WO02076441 (UNIV KENTUCKY RES FOUND [US], et al) [DX] 1-12,14-29 * pages 14-19 * * example 30 *; | [AD]US2004022861 (WILLIAMS ROBERT O [US], et al) [AD] 1-29* paragraphs [0017] - [0019] - [0021] , [0023] , [0064] - [0070] *; | [PX]EP1598060 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [PX] 1-29 * example 4 * * paragraphs [0015] - [0032] * * paragraph [0038] *; | [PX]EP1597973 (NESTEC SA [CH]) [PX] 1-29 * example 4 * * paragraphs [0009] , [0015] - [0032] * * paragraph [0039] *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004008837 A 20040115 (MIYAZAKI PREFECTURE) [X] 1,2,9-29 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0013] - [0035] - [0037] - [0058] , [0076] * * example 2 * | [X] - NAKANO M ET AL, "Dispersions of liquid crystalline phases of the monoolein/oleic acid/pluronic F127 system", LANGMUIR, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (2002), vol. 18, ISSN 0743-7463, pages 9283 - 9288, XP002344327 [X] 1-12,14,16-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la026297r | [X] - GUSTAFSSON ET AL, "Submicron particles of reversed lipid phases in water stabilized by a nonionic amphiphilic polymer", LANGMUIR, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1997), vol. 13, ISSN 0743-7463, pages 6964 - 6971, XP002344326 [X] 1-12,16-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la970566+ | [X] - NAKANO ET AL, "Small-angle X-ray scattering and 13-C NMR investigation on the internal structure of Cubosomes", LANGMUIR, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (2001), vol. 17, ISSN 0743-7463, pages 3917 - 3922, XP002344325 [X] 1-12,14-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la010224a | [X] - MONDUZZI ET AL, "A 13-C NMR study of aqueous dispersions of reversed lipid phases", LANGMUIR, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (2000), vol. 16, ISSN 0743-7463, pages 7355 - 7358, XP002344324 [X] 1-12,14-29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la0000872 |