EP1944161 - FLEXOGRAPHIC PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMEXI GROUP INDUSTRIES, S.A. Avda. Mas Pins, 135 Pol. Industrial de Girona 17457 Riudellots de la Selva / ES | [2010/14] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Comexi, SA Pol. Industrial de Giron Avenida Mas Pins. s/n 17457 Riudellots de la Selva (Girona) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESPARCH MARTÍ, Lluis Comexi, SA Pol. Industrial de Girona Avenida Mas Pins s/n E-17457 Riudellots de la Selva / ES | 02 /
PUIG VILA, Jordi Comexi, SA Pol. Industrial de Girona Avenida Mas Pins s/n E-17457 Riudellots de la Selva / ES | 03 /
CASTELLO PLAJA, Lluis Comexi, SA Pol. Industrial de Girona Avenida Mas Pins s/n E-17457 Riudellots de la Selva / ES | [2012/20] |
Former [2008/29] | 01 /
ESPARCH MARTÍ, Lluis Comexi, SA Pol. Industrial de Girona Avenida Mas Pins s/n E-17457 Riudellots de la Selva / ES | ||
02 /
PUIG VILA, Jordi Comexi, SA Pol. Industrial de Girona Avenida Mas Pins s/n E-17457 Riudellots de la Selva / ES | |||
03 /
CASTELLO PLAJA, Lluis Comexi, SA Pol. Industrial de Girona Avenida Mas Pins s/n E-17457 Riudellots de la Selva / ES | Representative(s) | Gislon, Gabriele, et al Torner, Juncosa i Associats, S.L. C/Pau Claris, 108, 1r 1a 08009 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | Gislon, Gabriele, et al Torner, Juncosa i Associats, S.L. C/Gran Via de les Corts Catalanes, 669bis 1è 2º 08013 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2008/29] | Gislon, Gabriele, et al Torner, Juncosa i Associats, S.L. c/ Bruc, 21 08010 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 06820007.0 | 29.09.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006ES00546 | Priority number, date | ES20050002640 | 31.10.2005 Original published format: ES 200502640 | [2008/29] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007051876 | Date: | 10.05.2007 | Language: | ES | [2007/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1944161 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1944161 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 10.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/24, B41F13/34, B41F5/24 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
B41F5/24 (EP,ES,US);
B41F3/56 (ES);
B41F13/24 (EP,US);
B41F13/34 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/29] | B41F5/24, B41F3/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Title | German: | FLEXODRUCKMASCHINE | [2012/08] | English: | FLEXOGRAPHIC PRINTER | [2008/29] | French: | MACHINE D'IMPRESSION FLEXOGRAPHIQUE | [2012/08] |
Former [2008/29] | FLEXODRUCKER | ||
Former [2008/29] | IMPRIMANTE FLEXOGRAPHIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2008 | Translation filed | 16.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 28.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   21.02.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2006 | AT | 16.05.2012 | BE | 16.05.2012 | CY | 16.05.2012 | DK | 16.05.2012 | EE | 16.05.2012 | FI | 16.05.2012 | LT | 16.05.2012 | LV | 16.05.2012 | NL | 16.05.2012 | PL | 16.05.2012 | RO | 16.05.2012 | SE | 16.05.2012 | SI | 16.05.2012 | SK | 16.05.2012 | TR | 16.05.2012 | BG | 16.08.2012 | GR | 17.08.2012 | IS | 16.09.2012 | PT | 17.09.2012 | GB | 29.09.2012 | IE | 29.09.2012 | LU | 29.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | FR | 01.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
TR | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
GB | 29.09.2012 | ||
IE | 29.09.2012 | ||
LU | 29.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
TR | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
GB | 29.09.2012 | ||
IE | 29.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
GB | 29.09.2012 | ||
IE | 29.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
GB | 29.09.2012 | ||
IE | 29.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
IE | 29.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 16.05.2012 | |
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 16.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0443160 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE]); | [AD]EP1080888 (PAPER CONVERTING MACHINE CO [US]); | [A]EP1158189 (UTECO S P A ROTO FLEXO & CONVE [IT]); | [A]DE10145957 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE]); | [A]WO03099567 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE], et al) | International search | [A]ES2074008 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE]); | [A]ES2112110 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE]); | [A]ES2127050 (NEOPACK S L [ES]); | [A]EP1080890 (PAPER CONVERTING MACHINE CO [US]) |