EP1940558 - METHOD FOR SUPPLYING LIQUID TO A SPRAYING DEVICE AND CARTRIDGE FOR SUCH A SPRAYING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osmooze ZA Champgrand, BP 64 26270 Loriol sur Drome / FR | [2008/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROUARD, Hugues Les Marellers 26300 Rochefort-Samson / FR | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | Marchand, André, et al Omnipat 610, chemin de Fabrègues 13510 Éguilles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Marchand, André, et al OMNIPAT, 24 Place des Martyrs de la Résistance 13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR | Application number, filing date | 06820147.4 | 04.10.2006 | [2008/28] | WO2006FR02232 | Priority number, date | FR20050010733 | 20.10.2005 Original published format: FR 0510733 | [2008/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007045738 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1940558 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1940558 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00, B65B11/26 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
B05B17/0607 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZUFUHR VON FLÜSSIGKEIT ZU EINER SPRÜHVORRICHTUNG UND PATRONE FÜR EINE SOLCHE SPRÜHVORRICHTUNG | [2008/28] | English: | METHOD FOR SUPPLYING LIQUID TO A SPRAYING DEVICE AND CARTRIDGE FOR SUCH A SPRAYING DEVICE | [2008/28] | French: | PROCEDE POUR ALIMENTER EN LIQUIDE UN DISPOSITIF DE NEBULISATION ET CARTOUCHE POUR UN TEL DISPOSITIF DE NEBULISATION | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 29.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.12.2008 | CY | 24.12.2008 | CZ | 24.12.2008 | DK | 24.12.2008 | EE | 24.12.2008 | FI | 24.12.2008 | IE | 24.12.2008 | IT | 24.12.2008 | LT | 24.12.2008 | LV | 24.12.2008 | NL | 24.12.2008 | PL | 24.12.2008 | RO | 24.12.2008 | SI | 24.12.2008 | SK | 24.12.2008 | TR | 24.12.2008 | BG | 24.03.2009 | SE | 24.03.2009 | GR | 25.03.2009 | ES | 04.04.2009 | IS | 24.04.2009 | PT | 25.05.2009 | HU | 25.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
IT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
HU | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
IT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | FI | 24.12.2008 | |
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 24.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10316140 ; | [A]US5484083 (JOULIA GERARD [FR]) [A] 1-22 * column 4, line 43 - column 56; figures 1,20 *; | [A]US5503302 (DEJONGE STUART W [US]) [A] 1-22 * column 3, line 4 - line 49; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE29920874U (BARNICKEL THOMAS C [DE]) [A] 1-22 * page 15, line 31 - page 16, line 5; figures 3,4 *; | [X]EP1008337 (BRACCO INT BV [NL]) [X] 1,2,9,11 * page 3, line 30 * * page 4, line 1 - line 12; figures 6,8 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10316140 A 19981202 (TOKAN KOGYO CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |