EP1943456 - ELEMENT FOR CONTROLLING FILLING AND/OR DRAWING OF A PRESSURIZED GAS, TANK AND CIRCUIT PROVIDED WITH SUCH AN ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2008/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PISOT, Philippe 5, rue des Racles 95290 L'isle Adam / FR | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | De Cuenca, Emmanuel Jaime L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | De Cuenca, Emmanuel Jaime L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2008/29] | De Cuenca, Emmanuel Jaime L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 75, quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06820309.0 | 18.10.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006FR51053 | Priority number, date | FR20050053261 | 27.10.2005 Original published format: FR 0553261 | [2008/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007048957 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1943456 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1943456 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F17C13/04, F16K1/30 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
F16K1/306 (EP,US);
F17C13/04 (EP,KR,US);
F16K1/30 (KR);
F17C2201/0104 (EP,US);
F17C2201/058 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0308 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0329 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0338 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0391 (EP,US);
F17C2221/012 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0123 (EP,US);
F17C2223/035 (EP,US);
F17C2227/048 (EP,US);
F17C2270/02 (EP,US);
Y02E60/32 (EP,US);
Y10T137/1797 (EP,US);
Y10T137/1963 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2012 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Extension states | AL | 27.05.2008 | BA | 27.05.2008 | HR | 27.05.2008 | MK | 27.05.2008 | RS | 27.05.2008 | Title | German: | ELEMENT ZUR STEUERUNG DER FÜLLUNG MIT UND/ODER ENTNAHME VON EINEM DRUCKGAS, TANK UND SCHALTUNG MIT EINEM SOLCHEN ELEMENT | [2008/29] | English: | ELEMENT FOR CONTROLLING FILLING AND/OR DRAWING OF A PRESSURIZED GAS, TANK AND CIRCUIT PROVIDED WITH SUCH AN ELEMENT | [2008/29] | French: | ORGANE DE CONTROLE DU REMPLISSAGE ET/OU DU SOUTIRAGE D'UN GAZ SOUS PRESSION, RESERVOIR ET CIRCUIT MUNIS D'UN TEL ORGANE | [2008/29] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 10.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.07.2010 | CY | 07.07.2010 | CZ | 07.07.2010 | DK | 07.07.2010 | EE | 07.07.2010 | FI | 07.07.2010 | IE | 07.07.2010 | IT | 07.07.2010 | LT | 07.07.2010 | LV | 07.07.2010 | NL | 07.07.2010 | PL | 07.07.2010 | RO | 07.07.2010 | SE | 07.07.2010 | SI | 07.07.2010 | SK | 07.07.2010 | TR | 07.07.2010 | BG | 07.10.2010 | GR | 08.10.2010 | ES | 18.10.2010 | LU | 18.10.2010 | BE | 31.10.2010 | CH | 31.10.2010 | LI | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | IS | 07.11.2010 | PT | 08.11.2010 | HU | 08.01.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
LU | 18.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
HU | 08.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
HU | 08.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | SI | 07.07.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0467769 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]); | [A]DE4334182 (FLOW INSTR & ENGINEERING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0668468 (AMCAST IND CORP [US]); | [A]EP1316755 (NIPPON OXYGEN CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]EP1367316 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]); | [A]US2004144803 (BAKER GEORGE D [US]) |