EP1955464 - A METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DIGITISING AN ELECTRICAL SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states U2T Photonics UK Limited 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | [2010/50] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states Filtronic PLC Unit 15, Parkview Court St Paul's Road Shipley BD18 3DX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEATON, John Filtronic Compound Semiconductors Ltd Heighington Lane Business Park Newton Aycliffe Co Durham DL5 6JW / GB | [2013/44] |
Former [2008/33] | 01 /
HEATON, John Filtronic Compound Semiconductors Ltd Heighington Lane Business Park Newton Aycliffe Co Durham DL5 6JW / GB | Representative(s) | McDonough, Jonathan, et al Stonehampton IP Law Limited 7 Wragley House Valley Road Hebden Bridge West Yorkshire HX7 7BN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | McDonough, Jonathan, et al Hepworth Browne 7 Wragley House Valley Road Hebden Bridge West Yorkshire HX7 7BN / GB | ||
Former [2009/47] | McDonough, Jonathan Leaman Browne Pearl Chambers 22 East Parade Leeds LS1 5BY / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | McDonough, Jonathan Gilholm Harrison Limited Marlborough House Westminster Place York Business Park Nether Poppleton York YO26 6RW / GB | Application number, filing date | 06820360.3 | 28.11.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006GB04450 | Priority number, date | GB20050024461 | 01.12.2005 Original published format: GB 0524461 | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007063292 | Date: | 07.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1955464 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1955464 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/08, H03M1/12 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
H04J14/08 (EP,GB,US);
H03M1/121 (EP,GB,US);
H04B10/2519 (EP,US);
H04B14/02 (GB);
H04J14/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] |
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM DIGITALISIEREN EINES ELEKTRISCHEN SIGNALS | [2008/33] | English: | A METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DIGITISING AN ELECTRICAL SIGNAL | [2008/33] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE NUMERISATION D'UN SIGNAL ELECTRIQUE | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 13.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/41] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 31.07.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 31.07.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.08.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.11.2006 | AT | 30.10.2013 | BE | 30.10.2013 | BG | 30.10.2013 | CY | 30.10.2013 | CZ | 30.10.2013 | DK | 30.10.2013 | EE | 30.10.2013 | ES | 30.10.2013 | FI | 30.10.2013 | IT | 30.10.2013 | LT | 30.10.2013 | LV | 30.10.2013 | MC | 30.10.2013 | NL | 30.10.2013 | PL | 30.10.2013 | RO | 30.10.2013 | SE | 30.10.2013 | SI | 30.10.2013 | SK | 30.10.2013 | TR | 30.10.2013 | IE | 28.11.2013 | LU | 28.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | FR | 30.12.2013 | GR | 31.01.2014 | IS | 28.02.2014 | PT | 28.02.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/38] | HU | 28.11.2006 | |
AT | 30.10.2013 | ||
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
GR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
TR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IE | 28.11.2013 | ||
LU | 28.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 30.12.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 28.11.2006 | |
AT | 30.10.2013 | ||
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
TR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IE | 28.11.2013 | ||
LU | 28.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 30.12.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
TR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IE | 28.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 30.12.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IE | 28.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 30.12.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IE | 28.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 30.12.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IE | 28.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 30.10.2013 | |
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 30.10.2013 | |
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 30.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5010346 (HAMILTON MICHAEL C [US], et al); | [A]US6100831 (FRANKEL MICHAEL Y [US]); |