EP1959789 - COSMETICS CASE WITH APPLICATOR HOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toly Products (UK) Limited Watkin Road Wembley, Middlesex HA9 0NL / GB | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARKER, Phillipe c/o Toly Products Ltd. B6 Bulebel Industrial Estate Zetjun, ZTN 08 / MT | [2012/03] |
Former [2008/35] | 01 /
PARKER, Phillipe Toly Products Ltd. B6 Bulebel Industrial Estate Zetjun, ZTN 08 / MT | Representative(s) | Hammler, Martin Franz, et al Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Hammler, Martin Franz, et al Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06820413.0 | 04.12.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006GB04528 | Priority number, date | GB20050024781 | 05.12.2005 Original published format: GB 0524781 | GB20060001193 | 20.01.2006 Original published format: GB 0601193 | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007066086 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1959789 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1959789 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A45D33/00, A45D40/22 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
A45D33/006 (EP,GB,US);
A45D33/26 (GB);
A45D34/00 (GB);
A45D40/00 (GB);
A45D40/14 (GB);
A45D40/221 (EP,GB,US);
Y10S206/823 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/22] |
Former [2008/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KOSMETIKBEHÄLTNIS MIT EINER HALTERUNG FÜR EINEN APPLIKATOR | [2012/03] | English: | COSMETICS CASE WITH APPLICATOR HOLDER | [2008/35] | French: | ÉTUI POUR PRODUIT COSMÉTIQUE AVEC SUPPORT POUR APPLICATEUR | [2012/03] |
Former [2008/35] | KOSMETIKKOFFER MIT APPLIKATORHALTER | ||
Former [2008/35] | ETUI POUR PRODUIT COSMETIQUE AVEC SUPPORT POUR APPLICATEUR | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 28.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   19.01.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2006 | AT | 13.06.2012 | BE | 13.06.2012 | CY | 13.06.2012 | CZ | 13.06.2012 | DK | 13.06.2012 | EE | 13.06.2012 | FI | 13.06.2012 | IT | 13.06.2012 | LT | 13.06.2012 | LV | 13.06.2012 | NL | 13.06.2012 | PL | 13.06.2012 | RO | 13.06.2012 | SE | 13.06.2012 | SI | 13.06.2012 | SK | 13.06.2012 | TR | 13.06.2012 | BG | 13.09.2012 | GR | 14.09.2012 | ES | 24.09.2012 | IS | 13.10.2012 | PT | 15.10.2012 | IE | 04.12.2012 | LU | 04.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
IE | 04.12.2012 | ||
LU | 04.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
IE | 04.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
IE | 04.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
IE | 04.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 13.06.2012 | |
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 13.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1540349 (LOESSER ERNEST W); | [X]FR903706 ; | [A]US5107984 (WELSCHOFF HEINZ [US]); | [DX]US6398027 (RYU BU KWANG [KR]); | [X]US2005056559 (CHEN CHANG-YING [TW]); | [X]US2005161356 (CHEN CHANG-YING [TW]) | by applicant | FR903706 | JPH10243814 | US6398027 |