EP1963186 - ASSEMBLY OF AIRCRAFT COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations Limited Pegasus House Aerospace Avenue Filton Bristol BS34 7PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states Airbus Operations Limited New Filton House Bristol BS99 7AR / GB | ||
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states Airbus UK Limited New Filton House, Filton Bristol, BS99 7AR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRUMPLER, Philip 46 Warren Road Filton Bristol BS34 7EJ / GB | 02 /
CLAYTON, Richard 3 Riversmill Walk Uley Road Dursley Gloucestershire GL11 5GL / GB | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Ford, James, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Ford, James, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/36] | Scott, Alistair Francis, et al Airbus UK Limited IP Dept. New Filton House Filton, Bristol BS99 7AR / GB | Application number, filing date | 06820547.5 | 14.12.2006 | [2008/36] | WO2006GB04711 | Priority number, date | GB20050025690 | 16.12.2005 Original published format: GB 0525690 | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007068949 | Date: | 21.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1963186 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1963186 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B64F5/00, B64C3/26, B23P19/00 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
B23P19/00 (EP,US);
B23P2700/01 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49888 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG VON FLUGZEUGKOMPONENTEN | [2008/36] | English: | ASSEMBLY OF AIRCRAFT COMPONENTS | [2008/36] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE DE COMPOSANTS D AERONEF | [2008/36] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 14.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.11.2010 | BE | 24.11.2010 | CY | 24.11.2010 | CZ | 24.11.2010 | DK | 24.11.2010 | EE | 24.11.2010 | FI | 24.11.2010 | LT | 24.11.2010 | LV | 24.11.2010 | NL | 24.11.2010 | PL | 24.11.2010 | RO | 24.11.2010 | SE | 24.11.2010 | SI | 24.11.2010 | SK | 24.11.2010 | TR | 24.11.2010 | IE | 14.12.2010 | LU | 14.12.2010 | CH | 31.12.2010 | LI | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | BG | 24.02.2011 | GR | 25.02.2011 | ES | 07.03.2011 | IS | 24.03.2011 | PT | 24.03.2011 | HU | 25.05.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 14.12.2010 | ||
LU | 14.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
HU | 25.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 14.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
HU | 25.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 14.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 24.11.2010 | |
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 24.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US3609116 (THOMAS JACK E, et al) [X] 15 * column 2, line 45 - line 59; figure - * [A] 13,14 [Y] 1-12; | [A]EP0269458 (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 49 - line 63; figure - *; | [A]WO0114208 (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB], et al) [A] * figure -; claims 1,5-7 *; | [A]WO0119936 (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 8, line 24 - line 25; figure -; claims 1-3 *; | [XA]WO03039851 (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB], et al) [X] 15 * page 5, line 14 - page 7, line L; figure - * [A] 1-14; | [XY]WO2004028785 (AIRBUS UK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 13-15 * figure -; claims 1-3,11,17 * * page 8, line 6 - line 18 * * page 19, line 21 - line 25 * * page 21, line 5 - line L * * page 22, line 6 - line 8 * * page 22, line 25 * [Y] 1-12; | [A]EP1473142 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0047]; figure - * |