EP1969711 - ELECTRIC MOTOR CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Limited Stratford Road Solihull, West Midlands B90 4AX / GB | [2010/30] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states TRW Limited Stratford Road Solihull, West Midlands B90 4LA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Connel, Brett 135 Cubbington Road Leamington Spa Warks CV32 7AP / GB | 02 /
DIXON, Christopher, David 55 Crossway Road Finham Coventry CV3 6JN / GB | 03 /
LI, Jiang 41 Queens Park Road Harborne Birmingham B32 2LB / GB | [2009/09] |
Former [2008/38] | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Connel, Brett 144 Leam Terrace Leamington Spa CV31 1DN / GB | ||
02 /
DIXON, Christopher, David 55 Crossway Road Finham Coventry CV3 6JN / GB | |||
03 /
LI, Jiang 41 Queens Park Road Harborne Birmingham B32 2LB / GB | Representative(s) | Wilson, Alan Stuart, et al Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | Wilson, Alan Stuart, et al Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [2008/38] | Wilson, Alan Stuart Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 06820628.3 | 21.12.2006 | [2008/38] | WO2006GB04870 | Priority number, date | GB20050026274 | 23.12.2005 Original published format: GB 0526274 | [2008/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007072025 | Date: | 28.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1969711 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1969711 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1969711 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02P21/14, H02P6/18 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
H02P6/182 (EP,US);
H02P6/18 (KR);
B62D5/046 (EP,US);
B62D5/065 (EP,US);
H02P21/18 (EP,US);
H02P6/185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/03] |
Former [2008/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMOTORSTEUERUNG | [2008/38] | English: | ELECTRIC MOTOR CONTROL | [2008/38] | French: | COMMANDE DE MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE | [2008/38] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 24.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 23.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 01.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2004249596 (HO EDDY YING YIN [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0007] - [0019]; figures 1-8 * [A] 3-22; | [A]US5701066 (MATSUURA SADAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-22 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 45; figures 1-4 * * column 8, line 20 - column 11, line 57 * | [XA] - PARASILITI F ET AL, "Sensorless speed control of a PM synchronous motor by sliding mode observer", INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, 1997. ISIE '97., PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON GUIMARAES, PORTUGAL 7-11 JULY 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19970707), ISBN 0-7803-3936-3, pages 1106 - 1111, XP010264987 [X] 1-5,8,13-22 * page 1106, column RIGHT - page 1111, column LEFT; figures 1,4 * [A] 6,7,9,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISIE.1997.648894 | [XA] - PARASILITI F ET AL, "Sensorless speed control of a PM synchronous motor based on sliding mode observer and extended Kalman filter", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 2001 IEEE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE. 36TH IAS ANNUAL MEETING . CHICAGO, IL, SEPT. 30 - OCT. 4, 2001, CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE IEEE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE. IAS ANNUAL MEETING, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20010930), VOL. 1 OF 4. CONF. 36, ISBN 0-7803-7114-3, pages 533 - 540, XP010561753 [X] 1-5 * page 533, column RIGHT - page 537, column RIGHT; figures 1-3 * * page 540 * [A] 6-22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IAS.2001.955472 | [XA] - HOSSAIN S ET AL, "Four quadrant and zero speed sensorless control of a switched reluctance motor", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 2002 IEEE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE. 37TH IAS ANNUAL MEETING . PITTSBURGH, PA, OCT. 13 - 18, 2002, CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE IEEE INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE. IAS ANNUAL MEETING, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20021013), vol. 1 OF 4. CONF. 37, ISBN 0-7803-7420-7, pages 1641 - 1646, XP010610099 [X] 1-5 * page 1642, column LEFT - column RIGHT * * page 1644, column RIGHT; figure 1 * [A] 6-22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IAS.2002.1043754 |