EP1929083 - Multilayer material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/24] | METHOD FOR TREATING NANOFIBER MATERIAL AND COMPOSITION OF NANOFIBER MATERIAL | ||
[2013/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Curamik Electronics GmbH Am Stadtwald 2 92676 Eschenbach / DE | [2011/20] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Electrovac AG Aufeldgasse 37- 39 3400 Klosterneuburg / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSE, Ka Chun Room 3619 Ming Yat House Kin Ming Estate Tiu Keng Leng NT Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
TANG, Ben, Zhong Flat 4A, Tower 12 Senior Staff Quarters HKUST Clear Water Bay Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | [2014/21] |
Former [2008/24] | 01 /
TSE, Ka Chun Room 3619 Ming Yat House Kin Ming Estate Tiu Keng Leng NT Hong Kong / CN | ||
02 /
TANG, Ben, Zhong Flat 4A, Tower 12 Senior Staff Quarters HKUST Clear Water Bay Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | Representative(s) | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Franz-Mayer-Str. 16a 93053 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | Graf Glück Kritzenberger Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2012/10] | Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Hermann-Köhl-Straße 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/30] | Graf, Helmut, et al Patentanwälte Graf Wasmeier Glück Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/24] | Graf, Helmut, et al Patentanwälte Graf Wasmeier Glück Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06820833.9 | 17.08.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006IB03056 | Priority number, date | DE20051046262 | 27.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005046262 | DE20051062182 | 23.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005062182 | DE20061032688 | 13.07.2006 Original published format: DE102006032688 | DE20061037185 | 09.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006037185 | [2008/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007036805 | Date: | 05.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1929083 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1929083 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | D06M11/83, D06M11/09, D06M11/55, D06M11/64, D01F11/00, D01F11/12, D01F11/14 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
D06M11/83 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
C01B32/168 (EP,US);
C04B35/62847 (EP,US);
C04B35/62876 (EP,US);
C04B35/62892 (EP,US);
C04B35/63452 (EP,US);
C04B35/6346 (EP,US);
C04B35/6455 (EP,US);
C04B37/028 (EP,US);
C08J5/005 (EP,US);
D01F11/10 (EP,US);
D01F11/12 (EP,US);
D01F11/14 (EP,US);
D06M11/09 (EP,US);
D06M11/55 (EP,US);
D06M11/64 (EP,US);
B32B2311/12 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3272 (EP,US);
C04B2235/408 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5248 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5288 (EP,US);
C04B2237/343 (EP,US);
C04B2237/368 (EP,US);
C04B2237/407 (EP,US);
C08J2379/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/238 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24074 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24174 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24994 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249948 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2998 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/24] | D06M11/83, D06M11/09 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, PL [2008/43] |
Former [2008/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mehrschichtmaterial | [2013/51] | English: | Multilayer material | [2013/51] | French: | Matériau multicouche | [2013/51] |
Former [2008/24] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON NANOFASERMATERIAL SOWIE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUS NANOFASERMATERIAL | ||
Former [2008/24] | METHOD FOR TREATING NANOFIBER MATERIAL AND COMPOSITION OF NANOFIBER MATERIAL | ||
Former [2008/24] | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'UN MATERIAU NANOFIBREUX, ET COMPOSITION DUDIT MATERIAU NANOFIBREUX | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 29.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PL | 21.05.2014 | AT | 17.08.2014 | [2015/51] |
Former [2014/50] | PL | 21.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO2004114404 (CURAMIK ELECTRONICS GMBH [DE], et al) [XD] 1-8,10,44,49,50,52-55,57,59-62,65 * page 9, paragraph LETZER - page 10, paragraph 1; claim - *; | [X]WO02075018 (ELECTROVAC [AT], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2004183127 ; | [X]JP2005200732 (UNIV SHINSHU, et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [XY]WO2005028174 (UNIV RICE WILLIAM M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10,15-20,24,25,44,47-49,52,53 * paragraphs [0016] - [0021]; claim - * * paragraphs [0006] , [0056] , [0057] * [Y] 74; | [X]WO2005040265 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,15,24-31,44,52-56,66 * page 6, line 6 - page 7, line 30; claim - *; | [Y]WO2004102659 (CURAMIK ELECTRONICS GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 74 * the whole document * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 51, Database accession no. 2004-528117, XP002421409 & JP2004183127 A 20040702 (ACHILLES CORP KK) [X] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2004114404 | WO02075018 | WO2005028174 | WO2005040265 |