EP1943862 - PS HANDOVER SUPPORT INDICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intellectual Ventures I LLC 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/42] | For all designated states Intellectual Ventures I LLC 3150 139th Avenue SE, Building 4 Bellevue WA 98005 / US | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Spyder Navigations L.L.C. 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | ||
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
For all designated states Spyder Navigations L.L.C. 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, Woonhee Juhanintie 6a FIN-02180 Espoo / FI | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | Small, Gary James, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | Small, Gary James, et al Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2008/29] | Roberts, Mark Peter J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06820837.0 | 01.11.2006 | [2008/29] | WO2006IB03072 | Priority number, date | US20050732681P | 01.11.2005 Original published format: US 732681 P | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007052130 | Date: | 10.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1943862 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1943862 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 19.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
H04W36/0066 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/0061 (KR);
H04W36/00222 (KR);
H04W36/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/14 (KR);
H04W92/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/29] | H04Q7/38, H04B7/005, H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGE EINER PS-WEITERLEITUNGS-UNTERSTÜTZUNG | [2008/29] | English: | PS HANDOVER SUPPORT INDICATION | [2008/29] | French: | INDICATION D'ACCEPTATION DE TRANSFERT PAR COMMUTATION PAR PAQUETS | [2008/29] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 10.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 10.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 05.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.11.2006 | AT | 12.06.2013 | BE | 12.06.2013 | CY | 12.06.2013 | CZ | 12.06.2013 | DK | 12.06.2013 | EE | 12.06.2013 | FI | 12.06.2013 | IT | 12.06.2013 | LT | 12.06.2013 | LV | 12.06.2013 | MC | 12.06.2013 | NL | 12.06.2013 | PL | 12.06.2013 | RO | 12.06.2013 | SE | 12.06.2013 | SI | 12.06.2013 | SK | 12.06.2013 | TR | 12.06.2013 | BG | 12.09.2013 | GR | 13.09.2013 | ES | 23.09.2013 | IS | 12.10.2013 | PT | 14.10.2013 | IE | 01.11.2013 | LU | 01.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
TR | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 01.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 01.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 01.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 12.06.2013 | |
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 12.06.2013 | |
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 12.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1420604 (SIEMENS MOBILE COMM SPA [IT]) [A] 1-16,18-20 * abstract ** paragraph [0024] *; | [Y]EP1503606 (SIEMENS MOBILE COMM SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-16,18-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0027] - [0039] - [0058] - [0062] * * paragraphs [0069] , [0082] * * page 19; table Appendix 2 * * figure 11 *; | [Y]WO2005027561 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [Y] 1-16,18-20 * abstract * * lines 4-38 - page 4 * * page 5, lines 34-6 * | International search | [Y]US2002160785 (OVESJO FREDRIK [SE], et al); | [P]WO2005125256 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [X] - "Proposed Draft Input to the TS on "Packet Switched Handover for GERAN A/Gb mode; Stage 2; (Release 6) v0.1.0", 3GPP TSG GERAN2#17-BIS, NOKIA TDOC G2-040082; AGENDA ITEM 5.4.5.2, (20040112), XP003009967 | [A] - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Packet-switched handover for GERAN A/Gb mode; Stage 2; (3GPP TS 43.129 version 6.5.0 Release 6)", ETSI TS 143 129 V6.5.0, (200511), XP014032914 | by applicant | EP1503606 | WO2005027561 |