EP2044657 - TIGHT ASSEMBLY FOR ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FCI 18 Parc Ariane III 3/5 Rue Alfred Kastler 78280 Guyancourt / FR | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/45] | For all designated states FCI 18 Prac Ariane III 3/5 rue Alfred Kastler 78280 Guyancourt / FR | ||
Former [2009/15] | For all designated states FCI IP Department 145/147 Rue Yves Le Coz F-78000 Versailles / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAZOTTES, Frédéric 48Bis, Rue de L'Aqueduc F-28130 Houx / FR | 02 /
CAMPFORT, Christian 28, rue Jeanne d'Arc F-28300 Fresnay le Gilmert / FR | 03 /
AESCHBACHER, Michel 40, rue de la Gare F-28300 Saint Prest / FR | [2009/18] |
Former [2009/15] | 01 /
CHAZOTTES, Frédéric 9, rue du Grand Pont F-28230 Epernon / FR | ||
02 /
CAMPFORT, Christian 28, rue Jeanne d'Arc F-28300 Fresnay le Gilmert / FR | |||
03 /
AESCHBACHER, Michel 40, rue de la Gare F-28300 Saint Prest / FR | Representative(s) | Regi, François-Xavier FCI - IP Department 18 Parc Ariane III 3/5 rue Alfred Kastler 78284 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | Regi, François-Xavier FCI - IP Department 18 Parc Ariane III 3/5 rue Alfred Kastler 78284 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/49] | Regi, François-Xavier FCI Département Propriété Industrielle 145/147, rue Yves Le Coz 78035 Versailles / FR | ||
Former [2009/15] | Regi, François-Xavier FCI-IP Department, 145/147 rue Yves Le Coz 78035 Versailles Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06821022.8 | 13.07.2006 | [2009/15] | WO2006IB03461 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008010019 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2044657 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2044657 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/52 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
H01R13/5208 (EP,US);
H01R13/52 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTE BAUGRUPPE FÜR EINEN ELEKTRISCHEN VERBINDER | [2010/18] | English: | TIGHT ASSEMBLY FOR ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR | [2009/15] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE SERRE POUR CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE | [2009/15] |
Former [2009/15] | STRAMME BAUGRUPPE FÜR EINEN ELEKTRISCHEN VERBINDER | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 30.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.12.2010 | BE | 01.12.2010 | CY | 01.12.2010 | CZ | 01.12.2010 | DK | 01.12.2010 | EE | 01.12.2010 | FI | 01.12.2010 | IT | 01.12.2010 | LT | 01.12.2010 | LV | 01.12.2010 | NL | 01.12.2010 | PL | 01.12.2010 | SE | 01.12.2010 | SI | 01.12.2010 | SK | 01.12.2010 | TR | 01.12.2010 | BG | 01.03.2011 | GR | 02.03.2011 | IS | 01.04.2011 | PT | 01.04.2011 | GB | 13.07.2011 | IE | 13.07.2011 | LU | 13.07.2011 | CH | 31.07.2011 | LI | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
GB | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 13.07.2011 | ||
LU | 13.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
GB | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
GB | 13.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 01.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0625807 (FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INT [FR]) [AD] 1-7* the whole document *; | [AD]WO2004025787 (FRAMATOME CONNECTORS INT [FR], et al) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1536527 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document * |