|
08.08.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2017 |
Information about intention to grant a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.08.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
79 |
|
23.08.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
79 |
|
03.08.2017 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.07.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.07.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.03.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
84 |
|
20.03.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
84 |
|
10.03.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2017 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2017 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2016 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2016 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.05.2011 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.07.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2008 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2008 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.12.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
12.12.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
12.12.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
78 |
|
24.05.2007 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
93 |