Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007125534 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2009 | A3 | WO2007125534 | 08.11.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US74606006 | 01.05.2006 | US80535906 | 21.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019151649 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US74606006 | 01.05.2006 | US9607708 | 25.06.2008 | US38043006 | 27.04.2006 | US201213532603 | 25.06.2012 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | US80535906 | 21.06.2006 | US55299706 | 26.10.2006 | US201514636628 | 03.03.2015 | US201816133330 | 17.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9415205 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2016 | B2 | US2015080979 | 19.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US74606006 | 01.05.2006 | WO2007IL00531 | 01.05.2007 | US29904308 | 30.10.2008 | US201414333184 | 16.07.2014 | US80535906 | 21.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8972017 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2015 | B2 | US2012330395 | 27.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US74606006 | 01.05.2006 | US9607708 | 25.06.2008 | US38043006 | 27.04.2006 | US201213532603 | 25.06.2012 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | US80535906 | 21.06.2006 | US55299706 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8694110 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2014 | B2 | US2012330375 | 27.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213532597 | 25.06.2012 | US38043006 | 27.04.2006 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | US201113036256 | 28.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8209036 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2012 | B2 | US2011152968 | 23.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US38043006 | 27.04.2006 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | US201113036256 | 28.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8382688 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2013 | B2 | US2010168622 | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74606006 | 01.05.2006 | US63109509 | 04.12.2009 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | US80535906 | 21.06.2006 | US55299706 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8209022 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2012 | B2 | US2009177131 | 09.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US9607706 | 16.11.2006 | US74606006 | 01.05.2006 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | US80535906 | 21.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8788049 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2014 | B2 | US2009069865 | 12.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US74606006 | 01.05.2006 | WO2007IL00531 | 01.05.2007 | US29904307 | 01.05.2007 | US80535906 | 21.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7899556 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2011 | B2 | US2007112394 | 17.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US38043006 | 27.04.2006 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7632239 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2009 | B2 | US2007112285 | 17.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74606006 | 01.05.2006 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | US80535906 | 21.06.2006 | US55299706 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11247048 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2022 | B2 | US2020155842 | 21.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816030065 | 09.07.2018 | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US74606006 | 01.05.2006 | WO2007IL00531 | 01.05.2007 | US201414333184 | 16.07.2014 | US201615237208 | 15.08.2016 | US202016773610 | 27.01.2020 | US80535906 | 21.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11058867 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2021 | B2 | US2019167975 | 06.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213532597 | 25.06.2012 | US201816139927 | 24.09.2018 | US38043006 | 27.04.2006 | US201414245597 | 04.04.2014 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | US201113036256 | 28.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10543365 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2020 | B2 | US2019009086 | 10.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816030065 | 09.07.2018 | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US74606006 | 01.05.2006 | WO2007IL00531 | 01.05.2007 | US29904308 | 30.10.2008 | US201414333184 | 16.07.2014 | US201615237208 | 15.08.2016 | US80535906 | 21.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10080885 | Global Dossier | 25.09.2018 | B2 | US2014303705 | 09.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213532597 | 25.06.2012 | US38043006 | 27.04.2006 | US201414245597 | 04.04.2014 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | US201113036256 | 28.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10076656 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2018 | B2 | US2015273205 | 01.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US74606006 | 01.05.2006 | US9607708 | 25.06.2008 | US38043006 | 27.04.2006 | US201213532603 | 25.06.2012 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | US80535906 | 21.06.2006 | US55299706 | 26.10.2006 | US201514636628 | 03.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10016598 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2018 | B2 | US2017065815 | 09.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US74606006 | 01.05.2006 | WO2007IL00531 | 01.05.2007 | US29904308 | 30.10.2008 | US201414333184 | 16.07.2014 | US201615237208 | 15.08.2016 | US80535906 | 21.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6178359B | Global Dossier | 09.08.2017 | B2 | JP2015134232 | 27.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US38043006 | 27.04.2006 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | US55299706 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5739944B | Global Dossier | 24.06.2015 | B2 | JP2013212420 | 17.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US38043006 | 27.04.2006 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | US55299706 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5324438B | Global Dossier | 23.10.2013 | B2 | JP2010509940 | 02.04.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US74606006 | 01.05.2006 | WO2007IL00531 | 01.05.2007 | US80535906 | 21.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2586489 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2014 | B1 | EP2586489 | 01.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US74606006 | 01.05.2006 | EP07736271 | 01.05.2007 | US80535906 | 21.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2012669 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2013 | B1 | EP2012669 | 21.04.2010 | A4 | EP2012669 | 14.01.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US74606006 | 01.05.2006 | WO2007IL00531 | 01.05.2007 | US80535906 | 21.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3033963 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2021 | C | CA3033963 | 24.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2930077 | 16.11.2006 | US38043006 | 27.04.2006 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | US55299706 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2956427 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2021 | C | CA2956427 | 08.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | CA2649663 | 01.05.2007 | US74606006 | 01.05.2006 | US80535906 | 21.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2930077 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2019 | C | CA2930077 | 24.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US38043006 | 27.04.2006 | CA2794533 | 16.11.2006 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | US55299706 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2794533 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2016 | C | CA2794533 | 24.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US38043006 | 27.04.2006 | CA2632196 | 16.11.2006 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | US55299706 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2649663 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2017 | C | CA2649663 | 08.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US74606006 | 01.05.2006 | WO2007IL00531 | 01.05.2007 | US80535906 | 21.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007245258B | Global Dossier | 19.09.2013 | B2 | AU2007245258 | 08.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US74606006 | 01.05.2006 | WO2007IL00531 | 01.05.2007 | US80535906 | 21.06.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006314072B | Global Dossier | 15.09.2011 | B2 | AU2006314072 | 25.09.2008 | A2 | AU2006314072 | 24.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US38043006 | 27.04.2006 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | US55299706 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1951365 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2017 | B1 | EP1951365 | 15.01.2014 | A4 | EP1951365 | 06.08.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US38043006 | 27.04.2006 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | US55299706 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2632196 | 22.01.2013 | C | CA2632196 | 24.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US38043006 | 27.04.2006 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | US55299706 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1951365T | 08.01.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US38043006 | 27.04.2006 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | US55299706 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2008013895 | 29.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006IL01326 | 16.11.2006 | US74606006 | 01.05.2006 | WO2007IL00531 | 01.05.2007 | US80535906 | 21.06.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007057899 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2011 | A3 | WO2007057899 | 24.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US38043006 | 27.04.2006 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | US55299706 | 26.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20090025184 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US38043006 | 27.04.2006 | US73685805 | 16.11.2005 | US55299706 | 26.10.2006 |