EP1951365 - GAIT MODULATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/32] | GAIT MODULATION SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
[2017/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.08.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bioness Neuromodulation Ltd 19 Hacharoshet Street 43654 Raanana / IL | [2008/46] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states N.E.S.S. Neuromuscular Electrical Stimulation Systems Ltd. 19 Ha'haroshet Street, P.O. Box 2500, Industrial Zone Ra'anana 43654 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAR, Amit P.o.box 193 40692 Kfar Hess / IL | 02 /
SHALEV, Yossef Hatikva 3 43506 Raanana / IL | 03 /
BAR-OR, Jonathan Gush-halav 67 37044 Pardes Hanna / IL | 04 /
NATHAN, Roger Zamenhof 25a 46592 Herzlia B / IL | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2017/40] |
Former [2009/52] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2008/32] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06821561.5 | 16.11.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006IL01326 | Priority number, date | US20050736858P | 16.11.2005 Original published format: US 736858 P | US20060380430 | 27.04.2006 Original published format: US 380430 | US20060552997 | 26.10.2006 Original published format: US 552997 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007057899 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1951365 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1951365 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/18, A61N1/04, A61N1/36 | [2014/03] | CPC: |
A61N1/36003 (EP,KR);
A61N1/0452 (KR);
A61N1/0456 (KR);
A61N1/0484 (EP,KR);
A61N1/36014 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2008/32] | A61N1/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/40] |
Former [2008/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GANGMODULATIONSSYSTEM | [2017/12] | English: | GAIT MODULATION SYSTEM | [2017/12] | French: | SYSTEME DE MODULATION DE DEMARCHE | [2017/12] |
Former [2008/32] | GANGMODULATIONSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2008/32] | GAIT MODULATION SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
Former [2008/32] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE MODULATION DE DEMARCHE | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 18.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 23.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2006 | AT | 04.10.2017 | CY | 04.10.2017 | CZ | 04.10.2017 | EE | 04.10.2017 | ES | 04.10.2017 | FI | 04.10.2017 | IT | 04.10.2017 | LT | 04.10.2017 | LV | 04.10.2017 | MC | 04.10.2017 | NL | 04.10.2017 | PL | 04.10.2017 | PT | 04.10.2017 | RO | 04.10.2017 | SI | 04.10.2017 | SK | 04.10.2017 | TR | 04.10.2017 | IE | 16.11.2017 | LU | 16.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | BG | 04.01.2018 | GR | 05.01.2018 | IS | 04.02.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | HU | 16.11.2006 | |
AT | 04.10.2017 | ||
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 16.11.2006 | |
AT | 04.10.2017 | ||
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.11.2006 | |
AT | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 16.11.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 16.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 04.10.2017 | |
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 04.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004082979 (TONG KAI-YU [HK], et al) [A] 1-24 * figures 3-6 * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0053] *; | [Y]US2003114892 (NATHAN ROGER H [IL], et al) [Y] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5643332 (STEIN RICHARD B [CA]) [Y] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2005192645 (STEIN RICHARD B [CA], et al) [Y] 9 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2003114893 (NATHAN ROGER H [IL], et al) [Y] 11-13 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2003114892 (NATHAN ROGER H [IL], et al); | [Y]US5643332 (STEIN RICHARD B [CA]); | [Y]US2005192645 (STEIN RICHARD B [CA], et al); | [Y]US2003114893 (NATHAN ROGER H [IL], et al); | [Y]US2005085708 (FAUVER MARK E [US], et al); | [Y]US6019877 (DUPELLE MICHAEL R [US], et al) |