Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1942474
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
16.11.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] |
30.07.2012 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
10.02.2012 |
First examination report |
|
09.02.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.02.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.07.2010 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] |
05.11.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.11.2008 |
Change - designated states |
published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] |
14.11.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] |
13.11.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
11.11.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.06.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
06.06.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
30.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.06.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|