EP1962026 - INDOOR MACHINE OF AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKADA, Youhei c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD., Shiga Plant, 1000-2, Aza Ootani, Okamoto-cho Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 5258526 / JP | 02 /
OGURA, Hirotoshi c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD., Shiga Plant, 1000-2, Aza Ootani, Okamoto-cho Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 5258526 / JP | 03 /
FUKUI, Norihito c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD., Shiga Plant, 1000-2, Aza Ootani, Okamoto-cho Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 5258526 / JP | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06822220.7 | 25.10.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006JP321243 | Priority number, date | JP20050317611 | 31.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005317611 | [2008/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007052509 | Date: | 10.05.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1962026 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F24F1/00 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
F24F1/0057 (EP,US);
F24F1/0059 (US);
F24F1/0063 (EP,US);
F24F1/0067 (EP,US);
F24F8/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INNENRAUMEINHEIT EINER KLIMAANLAGE | [2008/35] | English: | INDOOR MACHINE OF AIR CONDITIONER | [2008/35] | French: | MACHINE INTERIEURE D UN CLIMATISEUR | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2008 | Translation filed | 27.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 06.07.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9911983 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1 * page 10, line 12 - page 13, line 4 * * figures 1A,1B,4 *; | [A]EP1079184 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]JP2001248855 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [AD]JP2004156891 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [AD] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP1460348 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * |