EP1959051 - CARBON FIBER BUNDLE, PREPREG, AND CARBON FIBER REINFORCED COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKATA, Hiroaki c/o Ehime Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1515 Oaza-tsutsui, Masaki-cho Iyo-gun, Ehime 791-3193 / JP | 02 /
KUROKI, Motohiro c/o Ehime Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1515 Oaza-tsutsui, Masaki-cho Iyo-gun, Ehime 791-3193 / JP | 03 /
KOBAYASHI, Masanobu c/o Ehime Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 1515 Oaza-tsutsui, Masaki-cho Iyo-gun, Ehime 791-3193 / JP | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06823126.5 | 08.11.2006 | [2008/34] | WO2006JP322222 | Priority number, date | JP20050340560 | 25.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005340560 | [2008/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007060833 | Date: | 31.05.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1959051 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/55, C08J5/24, D06M101/40 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
D06M15/55 (EP,US);
C08J5/042 (EP,US);
C08J5/06 (EP,US);
C08J5/248 (EP,US);
C08J5/249 (EP,US);
C08J2363/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CARBONFASERBÜNDEL, PREPREG UND MIT CARBONFASER VERSTÄRKTER VERBUNDWERKSTOFF | [2008/34] | English: | CARBON FIBER BUNDLE, PREPREG, AND CARBON FIBER REINFORCED COMPOSITE MATERIAL | [2008/34] | French: | FAISCEAU DE FIBRES DE CARBONE, PRÉIMPRÉGNÉ ET MATERIAU COMPOSITE RENFORCE PAR DES FIBRES DE CARBONE | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2008 | Translation filed | 02.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 29.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/48] | 14.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0750004 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 4-8 * page 12, line 41 - line 42; claims 1,22,31,33 *; | [XY]EP1413670 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 8, line 31 - line 33 * * page 8, line 51 - line 53 * * page 9, line 3 - line 12 * * page 11, line 50 - line 56 * * page 12, line 22 - page 13, line 44 * * page 14, line 1 - line 52; claims 3,4,9,10 * [Y] 4-8; | [X]JP2004224979 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0027]; claims 1,2; tables 4-9 *; | [X]EP1566394 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [X] 1,2 * page 8, line 45 - page 9, line 3 * * page 11, line 44 - line 49 * * page 13, line 9 - line 12 * * page 19, line 41 - line 52 * * page 28, line 8 - line 22 * * page 29, line 6 - line 9; claims 9,24,32; tables 6,7 *; | [A]JP2005272765 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-8* paragraphs [0025] , [0026] , [0040] * |