EP1950194 - AROMATIC AMINE DERIVATIVE AND ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT ELEMENT USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. 1-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. 1-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YABUNOUCHI, Nobuhiro 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0293 / JP | 02 /
KAWAMURA, Masahiro 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0293 / JP | 03 /
YAMAMOTO, Hiroshi 1280, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0293 / JP | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06823298.2 | 10.11.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006JP322476 | Priority number, date | JP20050331382 | 16.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005331382 | JP20060021003 | 30.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006021003 | US20060458541 | 19.07.2006 Original published format: US 458541 | [2008/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007058127 | Date: | 24.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1950194 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C211/54, C07C211/58, C09K11/06, H01L51/50 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
C07C211/54 (EP);
C07C211/58 (EP);
C07C211/61 (EP);
C09K11/06 (EP);
H05B33/14 (EP);
H10K50/14 (EP);
H10K85/631 (EP);
H10K85/633 (EP);
C07C2603/26 (EP);
C07C2603/48 (EP);
C09K2211/1007 (EP);
C09K2211/1011 (EP);
C09K2211/1014 (EP);
H10K2102/103 (EP);
H10K85/324 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AROMATISCHES AMINDERIVAT UND ORGANISCHES ELEKTROLUMINESZIERENDES ELEMENT, BEI DEM DIESES VERWENDET WIRD | [2008/31] | English: | AROMATIC AMINE DERIVATIVE AND ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT ELEMENT USING THE SAME | [2008/31] | French: | DERIVE AMINE AROMATIQUE ET ELEMENT ELECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE METTANT EN OEUVRE CELUI-CI | [2008/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2008 | Translation filed | 25.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2008 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 31.08.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |