EP1926666 - CARTON WITH REINFORCED HANDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graphic Packaging International, LLC Law department - 9th floor 1500 Riveredge Parkway, Suite 100 Atlanta, GA 30328 / US | [2018/19] |
Former [2017/34] | For all designated states Graphic Packaging International, Inc. 1500 Riveredge Parkway, Suite 100 Atlanta, Georgia 30328 / US | ||
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states Graphic Packaging International, Inc. 814 Livingston Court Marietta, GA 30067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPIVEY, Raymond, Rudolph 475 Ivery Court Mableton GA 30126 / US | [2018/12] |
Former [2008/23] | 01 /
SPIVEY, Raymond, Rudolph 475 Ivery Court Mableton GA 30126 / US | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/12] | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | ||
Former [2008/23] | Grättinger & Partner (GbR) Wittelsbacherstrasse 5 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06824984.6 | 18.09.2006 | [2008/23] | WO2006US36246 | Priority number, date | US20050719040P | 21.09.2005 Original published format: US 719040 P | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007038044 | Date: | 05.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1926666 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1926666 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/36, B65D5/02, B65D5/44, B65D5/46 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
B65D71/36 (EP,US);
B65D5/0227 (EP,US);
B65D5/443 (EP,US);
B65D5/4608 (EP,US);
B65D5/46088 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00141 (EP,US);
B65D2571/0045 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00524 (EP,US);
B65D2571/0066 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00728 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/23] | B65D5/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/12] |
Former [2008/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KARTON MIT VERSTÄRKTEM GRIFF | [2008/23] | English: | CARTON WITH REINFORCED HANDLE | [2008/23] | French: | CARTON AVEC POIGNÉE RENFORCÉE | [2008/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 20.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 07.11.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.09.2006 | AT | 21.03.2018 | CY | 21.03.2018 | CZ | 21.03.2018 | DK | 21.03.2018 | EE | 21.03.2018 | FI | 21.03.2018 | IT | 21.03.2018 | LT | 21.03.2018 | LV | 21.03.2018 | MC | 21.03.2018 | PL | 21.03.2018 | RO | 21.03.2018 | SE | 21.03.2018 | SI | 21.03.2018 | SK | 21.03.2018 | TR | 21.03.2018 | BG | 21.06.2018 | GR | 22.06.2018 | IS | 21.07.2018 | PT | 23.07.2018 | IE | 18.09.2018 | LU | 18.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 18.09.2006 | |
AT | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
IE | 18.09.2018 | ||
LU | 18.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
TR | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
IE | 18.09.2018 | ||
LU | 18.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
IE | 18.09.2018 | ||
LU | 18.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
IE | 18.09.2018 | ||
LU | 18.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
LU | 18.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
IT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
SE | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
FI | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2196502 (KELLS BENJAMIN F) [X] 1,3-7,10,12-20,23,24,30,31 * the whole document * [A] 8,11; | [XA]WO9928198 (RIVERWOOD INT CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10-17,23,30,31 * page 2, line 11 - page 4, line 7; figures 1,2 * [A] 5,18,25; | [A]US4621766 (MCCLURE JACK A [US]) [A] * figures 1-10 * | by applicant | US2004000582 | US2004099542 |