EP1954419 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR HIGH PRESSURE EXTRUSION WITH MOLTEN ALUMINUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcoa Inc. 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069-001 / US | [2008/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMPLE, Vivek, M. 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069 / US | 02 /
GAYLORD, David 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069 / US | 03 /
PAOLA, Vincent, A. 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069 / US | 04 /
GHIARDI, Domenic, A. 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069 / US | 05 /
CHABAL, Ronald, G. 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069 / US | 06 /
KALLIVAYALIL, Jacob, A. 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069 / US | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Barton, Matthew Thomas Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Barton, Matthew Thomas Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Barton, Matthew Thomas Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06825979.5 | 13.10.2006 | [2008/33] | WO2006US40280 | Priority number, date | US20050726280P | 13.10.2005 Original published format: US 726280 P | US20060548726 | 12.10.2006 Original published format: US 548726 | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007044941 | Date: | 19.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1954419 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1954419 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B21C33/02, B22D11/10, B22D17/20 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
B21C33/02 (EP,KR,US);
B22D11/00 (EP,US);
B22D11/10 (EP,KR,US);
B22D17/20 (KR);
B22D17/2015 (EP,US);
B22D17/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR HOCHDRUCKSTRANGGUSS MIT SCHMELZALUMINIUM | [2008/33] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR HIGH PRESSURE EXTRUSION WITH MOLTEN ALUMINUM | [2008/33] | French: | APPAREIL ET METHODE POUR UNE EXTRUSION HAUTE PRESSION FAISANT APPEL A DE L'ALUMINIUM FONDU | [2008/33] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 30.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.04.2009 | BE | 15.04.2009 | CY | 15.04.2009 | CZ | 15.04.2009 | DK | 15.04.2009 | EE | 15.04.2009 | FI | 15.04.2009 | LT | 15.04.2009 | LV | 15.04.2009 | NL | 15.04.2009 | PL | 15.04.2009 | RO | 15.04.2009 | SI | 15.04.2009 | SK | 15.04.2009 | TR | 15.04.2009 | BG | 15.07.2009 | SE | 15.07.2009 | GR | 16.07.2009 | IS | 15.08.2009 | PT | 15.09.2009 | IE | 13.10.2009 | LU | 13.10.2009 | HU | 16.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
IE | 13.10.2009 | ||
LU | 13.10.2009 | ||
HU | 16.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
IE | 13.10.2009 | ||
LU | 13.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
IE | 13.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US2003056934 (SAMPLE VIVEK M [US], et al) [DA] 1,2,5,6,8,9,17,18,20-24* paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0068]; figures 1-8 *; | [DA]US2004017029 (SAMPLE VIVEK M [US], et al) [DA] 1,2,5,6,8,9,17,18,20-24 * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0089]; figures 1-8 * |