01.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
19.06.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
16.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
27.09.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
28.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
07.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] |
31.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] |
24.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] |
10.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] |
03.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
19.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
12.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
19.10.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
12.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.09.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.09.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
01.05.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.04.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] |
08.11.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.08.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.06.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.02.2010 |
First examination report |
|
03.02.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.11.2009 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] |
20.11.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] |
14.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.05.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] |
01.05.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] |
01.05.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] |
27.03.2009 |
Change - PCT data |
published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] |
15.10.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.08.2008 |
Change - inventor |
published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
04.07.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] |
04.07.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] |
24.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.04.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.04.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.06.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|