EP1951129 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR ENDOVASCULARLY CLIPPING AND REPAIRING LUMEN AND TISSUE DEFECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pulsar Vascular, Inc. 1600 E. Jefferson Street, Suite 501 Seattle WA 98122 / US | [2012/47] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Pulsar Vascular, Incorporated 1600 E. Jefferson Street, Suite 501 Seattle WA 98122 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESKRIDGE, Joseph 2210 - 89th Avenue N.e. Clyde Hill, Washington 98004 / US | 02 /
CLARKE, Gilbert 9528 - 130th N.E. Kirkland, Washington 98033 / US | 03 /
PEASE, Matthew 1671 Fordham Way Mountain View, California 94040 / US | 04 /
MAST, Gregory Martin 36281 Larch Way Freemont, California 94536 / US | 05 /
MUSKIVITCH, John Conrad 11687 Palm Sprint Court Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [2008/40] |
Former [2008/32] | 01 /
ESKRIDGE, Joseph 2210 - 89th Avenue N.e. Clyde Hill, Washington 98004 / US | ||
02 /
CLARKE, Gilbert 1301 - 1st Avenue, Apt. No. 2407 Seattle, Washington 98101 / US | |||
03 /
PEASE, Matthew 1671 Fordham Way Mountain View, California 94040 / US | |||
04 /
MAST, Gregory Martin 36281 Larch Way Freemont, California 94536 / US | |||
05 /
MUSKIVITCH, John Conrad 11687 Palm Sprint Court Cupertino, California 95014 / US | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | Høiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59 A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2009/26] | HOEIBERG A/S European Patent & Trademark Attorneys Store Kongensgade 59 A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2008/32] | HOEIBERG A/S Store Kongensgade 59B 1264 Copenhagen K. / DK | Application number, filing date | 06826291.4 | 18.10.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006US40907 | Priority number, date | US20050728052P | 19.10.2005 Original published format: US 728052 P | US20060324827 | 03.01.2006 Original published format: US 324827 | US20060747400P | 16.05.2006 Original published format: US 747400 P | US20060803200P | 25.05.2006 Original published format: US 803200 P | US20060823730P | 28.08.2006 Original published format: US 823730 P | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007047851 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1951129 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1951129 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/08, A61M29/00, A61B17/12 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
A61B17/12022 (EP,US);
A61B17/08 (KR);
A61B17/122 (US);
A61B17/04 (KR);
A61B17/11 (KR);
A61B17/12113 (EP,US);
A61B17/12172 (EP,US);
A61B17/12109 (US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1205 (EP,US);
A61B2017/12054 (EP,US);
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
A61F2/06 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/23] | A61B17/08, A61M29/00 | ||
Former IPC [2008/32] | A61B17/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUM ENDOVASKULÄREN CLIPPEN UND REPARIEREN VON LUMEN- UND GEWEBSDEFEKTEN | [2008/32] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR ENDOVASCULARLY CLIPPING AND REPAIRING LUMEN AND TISSUE DEFECTS | [2008/32] | French: | PROCEDES ET SYSTEMES D'AGRAFAGE ET DE REPARATION PAR VOIE ENDOVASCULAIRE D'ANOMALIES DANS DES LUMIERES OU DES TISSUS | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 03.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.10.2006 | AT | 21.11.2012 | BE | 21.11.2012 | CY | 21.11.2012 | CZ | 21.11.2012 | DK | 21.11.2012 | EE | 21.11.2012 | FI | 21.11.2012 | IS | 21.11.2012 | IT | 21.11.2012 | LT | 21.11.2012 | LV | 21.11.2012 | MC | 21.11.2012 | NL | 21.11.2012 | PL | 21.11.2012 | RO | 21.11.2012 | SE | 21.11.2012 | SI | 21.11.2012 | SK | 21.11.2012 | TR | 21.11.2012 | BG | 21.02.2013 | GR | 22.02.2013 | ES | 04.03.2013 | PT | 21.03.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 18.10.2006 | |
AT | 21.11.2012 | ||
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 21.11.2012 | |
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 21.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6093199 (BROWN PETER S [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 7, lines 13-20; figure 5a *; | [X]WO02071977 (ATRITECH INC [US]) [X] 1 * figure 1c *; | [X]US6613074 (MITELBERG VLADIMIR [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 5, lines 21,47; figures 1-4,6 *; | [X]US2003181922 (ALFERNESS CLIFTON A [US]) [X] 1 * figure 5 *; | [X]US6652556 (VANTASSEL ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 10, line 46 - column 11, line 13; figures 5,63-65 *; | [X]WO2005082279 (TORAX MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 1* figure 3 * | International search | [X]US6383174 (EDER JOSEPH C [US]); | [Y]US6652556 (VANTASSEL ROBERT A [US], et al) |