EP2002427 - PITCH PREDICTION FOR PACKET LOSS CONCEALMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mindspeed Technologies, Inc. 4000 MacArthur Blvd., East Tower Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | [2008/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Yang 26586 San Torini Road Mission Viejo, CA 92692 / US | [2008/51] | Representative(s) | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 06826581.8 | 23.10.2006 | [2008/51] | WO2006US41508 | Priority number, date | US20060385432 | 20.03.2006 Original published format: US 385432 | [2008/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007111647 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2002427 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2002427 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/00 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
G10L19/005 (EP,KR,US);
G10L21/02 (KR);
G10L25/90 (KR);
G10L19/09 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/08] | G10L19/14, G10L11/04, G10L11/00 | ||
Former IPC [2008/51] | G10L19/04, G10L11/04, G10L11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TONHÖHENPRÄDIKTION ZUM VERBERGEN VON PAKETVERLUSTEN | [2008/51] | English: | PITCH PREDICTION FOR PACKET LOSS CONCEALMENT | [2008/51] | French: | PREDICTION DE HAUTEUR TONALE POUR MASQUAGE DE PERTE DE PAQUET | [2008/51] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 16.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.03.2011 | BE | 23.03.2011 | CY | 23.03.2011 | CZ | 23.03.2011 | DK | 23.03.2011 | EE | 23.03.2011 | HU | 23.03.2011 | IT | 23.03.2011 | LT | 23.03.2011 | LV | 23.03.2011 | NL | 23.03.2011 | PL | 23.03.2011 | RO | 23.03.2011 | SI | 23.03.2011 | SK | 23.03.2011 | TR | 23.03.2011 | BG | 23.06.2011 | GR | 24.06.2011 | ES | 04.07.2011 | IS | 23.07.2011 | PT | 25.07.2011 | IE | 23.10.2011 | LU | 23.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
TR | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
IE | 23.10.2011 | ||
LU | 23.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
IE | 23.10.2011 | ||
LU | 23.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
IE | 23.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 23.03.2011 | |
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003078769 (CHEN JUIN-HWEY [US]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0129] *; | [A]US6636829 (BENYASSINE ADIL [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 18, line 61 - column 19, line 6 *; | [A] - BRONSTEIN, Taschenbuch der Mathematik, VERLAG HARRI DEUTSCH, (1995), ISBN 3-8171-2002-8, XP002556152 [A] 1-10 * page 645 - page 647 * | International search | [Y]US5105464 (ZINSER RICHARD L [US]); | [Y]US5884010 (CHEN JUIN-HWEY [US], et al); | [Y]US2002091523 (MAKINEN JARI [FI], et al) |