EP1951514 - RELEASE COATING CONTAINING THERMOPLASTIC POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIZIO, James P. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
BANY, Stephen W. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
MANORE, Janice R. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
DA SILVA, Ricardo H. 3M Brazil Via Anhanguera Km 100 Sumare 13181-900 Sao Paulo / BR | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/50] | Wilhelm, Stefan 3M Deutschland GmbH Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | ||
Former [2008/32] | Wilhelm, Stefan 3M Deutschland GmbH Carl-Schurz-Strasse 1 41453 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 06826692.3 | 27.10.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006US41711 | Priority number, date | US20050268409 | 03.11.2005 Original published format: US 268409 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007053405 | Date: | 10.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1951514 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/12, B32B27/08, B32B27/18, C09J7/02 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
A61F13/58 (EP,US);
C09D183/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/32] | B32B7/12, B32B27/08, B32B27/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHE POLYMERE ENTHALTENDE TRENNBESCHICHTUNG | [2008/32] | English: | RELEASE COATING CONTAINING THERMOPLASTIC POLYMERS | [2008/32] | French: | REVETEMENT DE SEPARATION CONTENANT DES POLYMERES THERMOPLASTIQUES | [2008/32] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2008 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 24.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH09207285 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [A]WO0061693 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]); | [A]US2003219591 (BANY STEPHEN W [US], et al) |