EP1961043 - UNIVERSAL PAD ARRANGEMENT FOR SURFACE MOUNTED SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, NL, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL RECTIFIER CORPORATION 233 Kansas Street El Segundo, CA 90245 / US | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STANDING, Martin 19 Barden Park Road Tonbridge, Kent TN9 1XD / GB | 02 /
SAWLE, Andrew N. 42 Garden Wood Road East Grinstead, West Sussex RH19 1NL / GB | [2015/28] |
Former [2008/35] | 01 /
STANDING, Martin 19 Barden Park Road Tonbridge Kent TN9 1XD / GB | ||
02 /
SAWLE, Andrew N. 42 Garden Wood Road East Grinstead West Sussex RH19 1NL / GB | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2015/28] |
Former [2010/10] | Weitzel, Wolfgang Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patentanwälte Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2010/02] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vinazzer, Edith European Patent Attorney Schönburgstrasse 11/7 1040 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 06826753.3 | 24.10.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006US41813 | Priority number, date | US20050729985P | 25.10.2005 Original published format: US 729985 P | US20060551767 | 23.10.2006 Original published format: US 551767 | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007050774 | Date: | 03.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1961043 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1961043 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/11, H05K7/10, H05K1/18, H01L23/495 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
H05K1/111 (EP,US);
H05K1/0295 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09954 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10166 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/35] | H01L23/495 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/28] |
Former [2008/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNIVERSAL-KONTAKTSTELLENANORDNUNG FÜR HALBLEITERBAUELEMENTE MIT OBERFLÄCHENANBRINGUNG | [2008/35] | English: | UNIVERSAL PAD ARRANGEMENT FOR SURFACE MOUNTED SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES | [2008/35] | French: | MECANISME DE PLAGE D'ACCUEIL UNIVERSELLE POUR DISPOSITIFS A SEMICONDUCTEURS MONTES EN SURFACE | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 03.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 05.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 27.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 27.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 27.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 27.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2006 | AT | 08.07.2015 | BE | 08.07.2015 | BG | 08.07.2015 | CY | 08.07.2015 | CZ | 08.07.2015 | DK | 08.07.2015 | EE | 08.07.2015 | ES | 08.07.2015 | FI | 08.07.2015 | IT | 08.07.2015 | LT | 08.07.2015 | LV | 08.07.2015 | MC | 08.07.2015 | NL | 08.07.2015 | PL | 08.07.2015 | RO | 08.07.2015 | SE | 08.07.2015 | SI | 08.07.2015 | SK | 08.07.2015 | TR | 08.07.2015 | GR | 09.10.2015 | GB | 24.10.2015 | IE | 24.10.2015 | LU | 24.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | FR | 02.11.2015 | IS | 08.11.2015 | PT | 09.11.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
GB | 24.10.2015 | ||
IE | 24.10.2015 | ||
LU | 24.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
GB | 24.10.2015 | ||
IE | 24.10.2015 | ||
LU | 24.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
GB | 24.10.2015 | ||
LU | 24.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
GB | 24.10.2015 | ||
LU | 24.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
LU | 24.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
LU | 24.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 08.07.2015 | |
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 08.07.2015 | |
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 08.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4489365 (DABERKOE DAVID P [US]) [Y] 1-9 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 26; figures 1-6 *; | [DY]US2001048116 (STANDING MARTIN [GB], et al) [DY] 1-9* abstract * | International search | [X]US2005087847 (KUAN LEE C [SG], et al) | Examination | US6624522 | by applicant | US6624522 | US4489365 |