EP1952455 - ORGANIC PHOTOVOLTAIC CELLS UTILIZING ULTRATHIN SENSITIZING LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY P.O. Box 36 Princeton, NJ 08544-0036 / US | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAND, Barry, P. 10 Wilner Road Somers, NY 10589 / US | 02 /
FORREST, Stephen, R. 336 ROCK CREEK COURT Ann Arbor, MI 48104 / US | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Kiriczi, Sven Bernhard, et al Schneiders & Behrendt PartmbB Patentanwälte, München Mühlthaler Strasse 91c 81475 München / DE | [2020/03] |
Former [2008/32] | Kiriczi, Sven Bernhard, et al Schneiders & Behrendt Mühlthaler Strasse 91 D 81475 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06826859.8 | 26.10.2006 | [2008/32] | WO2006US41990 | Priority number, date | US20050263865 | 02.11.2005 Original published format: US 263865 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007055931 | Date: | 18.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1952455 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1952455 | Date: | 15.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/42 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
H10K30/211 (EP,KR,US);
H10K30/30 (EP,KR,US);
H10K30/353 (EP,KR);
H10K30/57 (EP,KR);
H10K85/211 (EP,US);
H10K85/311 (EP,US);
H10K85/657 (EP,US);
H10K85/6572 (EP,US);
Y02E10/549 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2020/03] |
Former [2008/48] | DE, ES, FR, GB | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORGANISCHE PHOTOVOLTAIKZELLEN MIT EINER ULTRADÜNNEN LICHTEMPFINDLICHEN SCHICHT | [2019/42] | English: | ORGANIC PHOTOVOLTAIC CELLS UTILIZING ULTRATHIN SENSITIZING LAYER | [2008/32] | French: | CELLULES PHOTOVOLTAIQUES ORGANIQUES UTILISANT UNE COUCHE DE SENSIBILISATION ULTRA-MINCE | [2008/32] |
Former [2008/32] | ORGANISCHE PHOTOVOLTAIKZELLEN MIT ULTRADÜNNER SENSIBILISIERUNGSSCHICHT | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 03.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5201961 (YOSHIKAWA MASAO [US], et al); | [Y]WO2005101524 (UNIV PRINCETON [US], et al); | Examination | JP2947588B |