EP2018278 - LABEL SHEET ASSEMBLY, APPLICATION KIT AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avery Dennison 150 North Orange Grove Boulevard Pasadena, CA 91103-3596 / US | [2009/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASTILLO, Arthur G. 15040 Camino Arroyo Chino Hills, California 91709 / US | 02 /
HONG, Le-Hoa 203 S. Sierra Vista Monterey Park, California 91755 / US | 03 /
MARTIN, Douglas W. 1051 E. Stearns Ave., 35 La Habra, California 90631 / US | 04 /
SANCHEZ, Elizabeth M. 1004 Marion Drive Glendale, California 91205 / US | 05 /
MORIEL, Jesus A. U. Paseo De Las Flores 143-A Juarez, 32440 / MX | 06 /
RAMON, Carlos L. Profesora Hortencia Solis Ontiveros 602 Fraccionamiento Horizontes Del Sur Juarez, 32575 / MX | 07 /
MUNOZ, Jose E. P. Solar De Claveles 2350-25 Fraccionamiento Villas Solares Iv Juarez, 32546 / MX | 08 /
UGOLICK, Ron 244 Calle Concordia San Dimas, California 91773 / US | 09 /
HODSDON, Jerry G. P.O. Box 1299 Forestdale, Massachusetts 02644 / US | 10 /
TATARYAN, Anahit 10627 Bogue St. Temple City, California 91780 / US | [2009/05] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/05] | Fritsche, Rainer Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06827247.5 | 31.10.2006 | [2009/05] | WO2006US42604 | Priority number, date | US20060799238P | 09.05.2006 Original published format: US 799238 P | [2009/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007130128 | Date: | 15.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2018278 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B42F21/02, B42F21/00 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
B42F21/02 (EP,US);
B42F21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/05] | Title | German: | ETIKETTENBLATTANORDNUNG, ANWENDUNGSSATZ UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2009/05] | English: | LABEL SHEET ASSEMBLY, APPLICATION KIT AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME | [2009/05] | French: | ENSEMBLE FEUILLE D'ÉTIQUETTES, KIT D'APPLICATION ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2009/05] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/05] | 07.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/06] | 01.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9847771 (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,3,6,9* the whole document *; | [A]US6803084 (DO SUNG [US], et al) [A] 1,3,6,9 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6803084 |